Global Patent Index - EP 1238595 A2

EP 1238595 A2 2002-09-11 - Stab resistant body armour

Title (en)

Stab resistant body armour

Title (de)

Körperschutzpanzerung, insbesondere für den Stichschutz

Title (fr)

Armure corporelle en particulier contre les coupures

Publication

EP 1238595 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005152 A

Priority

DE 10110851 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10110851C1] A body armour, esp for protection against pricks, consists of at least two surface elements which have connecting linkages. The surface elements (2) are connected and have gaps (3) between them which are closed using a closure element (8). The closure element consists of EPDM.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Körperschutzpanzerung, insbesondere für den Stichschutz, bestehend aus mindestens zwei Flächenelementen, die zur körpergerechten Anpassung mit Gelenken verbunden sind. Um eine Körperschutzpanzerung zu schaffen, die verbesserte Sicherheitseigenschaften, insbesondere einen besseren Stichschutz, bei Erhaltung eines ausreichenden Tragekomforts aufweist, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Flächenelemente (2) unter Bildung von Spaltöffnungen (3) miteinander verbunden sind und zwischen den Flächenelementen in zumindest einem Teilbereich der Spaltöffnung (3) zum Verschließen der Spaltöffnung (3) ein Verschlußelement (8) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 31/00 (2006.01); F41H 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 31/0055 (2013.01); F41H 5/0492 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10110851 C1 20020529; AT 367102 T 20070815; DE 50210477 D1 20070830; EP 1238595 A2 20020911; EP 1238595 A3 20040107; EP 1238595 B1 20070718; ES 2290210 T3 20080216

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180320

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-09-30 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Effective date: 20120114

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-05-31 [PGRI NL] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Effective date: 20110121

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2011-01-12 [REG NL RD1H] A REQUEST FOR RESTORATION TO THE PRIOR STATE HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20091208

2010-12-22 [REG NL RD1H] A REQUEST FOR RESTORATION TO THE PRIOR STATE HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20091208

2010-11-17 [REG NL RD1H] A REQUEST FOR RESTORATION TO THE PRIOR STATE HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20091208

2010-10-20 [REG NL RD1H] A REQUEST FOR RESTORATION TO THE PRIOR STATE HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20091208

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080307

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-02-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: A REQUEST FOR RESTORATION TO THE PRIOR STATE (ARTICLE 23 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995) HAS BEEN FILED ON 20091208

2009-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MULLER, LOTHAR

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080314

2008-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080421

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071019

2008-03-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-03-05 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2290210 T3

2008-02-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071218

2007-12-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20070718

2007-10-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2007-10-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-09-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210477 P 20070830

2007-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV MK RO SI

2007-07-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-29 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040707

- Countries: LT

2004-09-29 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040707

- Countries: LV

2004-09-29 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040707

- Countries: MK

2004-09-29 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040707

- Countries: RO

2004-09-29 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040707

- Countries: SI

2004-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI