Global Patent Index - EP 1238602 A2

EP 1238602 A2 2002-09-11 - Fast interlockable stackable suitcase

Title (en)

Fast interlockable stackable suitcase

Title (de)

Schnellverriegelbar stapelbarer Koffer

Title (fr)

Valise empilable à accrochage rapide

Publication

EP 1238602 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005412 A

Priority

DE 20104108 U

Abstract (en)

Stacking case comprises a box- or dish-shaped first housing (14, 14') and a preferably likewise essentially box- or dish-shaped second housing (18, 18'). A first connecting device (28) is fixed to the first housing and a second connecting device (30) is fixed to the second housing. A detachable connection is produced between the first housing and the second housing to form a transport unit consisting of the two cases.

Abstract (de)

Ein stapelbarer Koffer mit einem halbschalenförmigen Unterteil (14, 14') und einem bezüglich dem Unterteil (14, 14') öffnungsseitig angeordneten ebenfalls halbschalenförmig ausgebildeten Deckelteil (18, 18'), wobei eine Stapelung wenigstens zweier Koffer (10, 12) dadurch erfolgt, dass jeweils ein Deckelteil (18, 18') eines ersten Koffers (10) an ein Unterteil (14') eines unmittelbar angrenzenden zweiten Koffers (12) anliegt, sieht zur möglichst einfachen und schnellen Fixierung zweier Koffer unter Bildung einer Transporteinheit vor, dass im Bereich wenigstens zweier Stirnseiten des Unterteils (14, 14') wenigstens zwei bügelförmige erste Befestigungselemente (28) angeordnet sind, welche mit an wenigstens zwei gegenüberliegenden Stirnseiten des Deckelteils (18, 18') angeordneten zweiten Befestigungselementen (30) so zusammenwirken, dass eine stabile, lösbare Verbindung zwischen dem Unterteil (14, 14') des ersten Koffers (10) und dem Deckelteil (18, 18') des an den ersten Koffer (10) unmittelbar angrenzenden zweiten Koffers (12) herstellbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 7/00 (2006.01); B65D 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 7/0045 (2013.01); B65D 21/0228 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20104108 U1 20010607; EP 1238602 A2 20020911; EP 1238602 A3 20030903; EP 1238602 B1 20050615; ES 2244685 T3 20051216; PT 1238602 E 20051031

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50203391

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140325

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130909

2013-09-17 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130909

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120309

2013-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120308

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120308

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120308

2012-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20120223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110401

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2244685 T3

2005-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-10-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050926

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50203391 P 20050721

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031227

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 45C 7/00 A

2003-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 21/02 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI