Global Patent Index - EP 1238603 A2

EP 1238603 A2 2002-09-11 - Cosmetic stick

Title (en)

Cosmetic stick

Title (de)

Kosmetikstift

Title (fr)

Batonnet cosmétique

Publication

EP 1238603 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005016 A

Priority

DE 10111570 A

Abstract (en)

The interior of a first housing part (2) contains the cosmetic (3). The applicator (7) or applicator-holder (8) is joined to an operating bar (10) which penetrates outside through the closed rear end of the second housing-part (4). The operating-bar and applicator turn and slide longitudinally by means of the protruding section (14) or the cap (15) placed on the protruding section. One helical spring (18) is supported on a sealing-stopper (12); another helical spring (17') is supported on an inner shoulder (23) of the second housing part and on a shoulder (24) of the applicator-holder.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Kosmetikstift umfassend ein als Vorratsbehälter ausgebildetes erstes Gehäuseteil, in dessen Innenraum das zu applizierende Kosmetikum untergebracht ist, ist vorgesehen, daß der Applikator (7) oder Applikator-Halter (8) mit einer Betätigungsstange (10) verbunden ist, welche das abgeschlossene rückwärtige Ende des zweiten Gehäuseteils (4) nach außen hin durchsetzt, wobei die Betätigungsstange (10) und damit der Applikator (7) über den vorstehenden Abschnitt (14) bzw. eine auf diesen aufgesetzte Kappe (15) drehbar und längs verschiebbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/26; A45D 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 33/00 (2006.01); A45D 40/20 (2006.01); A45D 40/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 33/00 (2013.01); A45D 40/20 (2013.01); A45D 40/205 (2013.01); A45D 40/265 (2013.01); A45D 2040/207 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238603 A2 20020911; EP 1238603 A3 20030917; DE 10111570 A1 20020912

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI