Global Patent Index - EP 1238605 A1

EP 1238605 A1 2002-09-11 - Suspension fitting for cabinet

Title (en)

Suspension fitting for cabinet

Title (de)

Schrankaufhängevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Accessoire de suspension pour armoire

Publication

EP 1238605 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02004054 A

Priority

DE 20103728 U

Abstract (en)

Cupboard hanging device has a base plate and an adjusting hook . The base plate lies in the mounted state on the rear wall of a cupboard and is provided with supporting parts that are inserted into bores of a side wall of the cupboard. The plate is fixed to the rear wall using strandling dowels (11), locking parts or blind rivets. Preferred Features: The dowels are made of plastic with a base rail (10).

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist eine Schrankaufhängevorrichtung (2) mit einer Basisplatte (3) und einem daran justierbar angeschlossenen Aufhängehaken (4), wobei die Basisplatte (3) im montierten Zustand auf der Rückwand (8) eines Schrankmöbels (1) aufliegt und mit in Bohrungen (6) einer Seitenwand (7) des Schrankmöbels (1) eintreibbaren Tragteilen versehen ist und durch Befestigungsmittel gegenüber der Rückwand (8) fixierbar ist. Erfindungsgemäß sind als Befestigungsmittel zur Fixierung der Basisplatte (3) gegenüber einer Rückwand (8) eines Schrankmöbels (1) einfache Spreizdübel (11), alternativ hierzu Verriegelungsteile (20) mit Hintergreigungsköpfen (21) oder Blind-Niete (24) vorgesehen. Bei der erfindungsgemäßen Schrankaufhängevorrichtung werden die Hauptbelastungen über die in die ohnehin stabile Seitenwand (7) eingreifenden Tragteile (5) abgetragen und die verhältnismäßig einfach gestaltete Verbindung zwischen der Basisplatte (3) und der Rückwand (8) eines Schrankmöbels (1) dient letztendlich nur noch zur Lagefixierung der gesamten Schrankaufhängevorrichtung gegenüber einem entsprechenden Schrankmöbel (1), wenngleich auch in diesem Bereich noch eine geringfügige Kraftabtragung erfolgen kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 95/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 95/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 95/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 20103728 U1 20010503; DE 50208372 D1 20061123; EP 1238605 A1 20020911; EP 1238605 B1 20061011; ES 2272585 T3 20070501

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150224

2016-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-02 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150901

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070712

2007-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2272585 T3

2007-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50208372 P 20061123

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL

2006-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061011

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI