Global Patent Index - EP 1238607 A2

EP 1238607 A2 2002-09-11 - Foldable picture exchange frame and articulated joint

Title (en)

Foldable picture exchange frame and articulated joint

Title (de)

Klappbarer Wechselrahmen sowie Gelenkverbindung hierfür

Title (fr)

Cadre pliant pour image échangeable et joint articulé

Publication

EP 1238607 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004266 A

Priority

DE 10111482 A

Abstract (en)

The interchangeable frame(1) has an inner frame (2) placed against a firm surface, and an outer frame (3). The inner and outer frames are joined by at least one hinge joint which enables the outer frame to fold down in relation to the inner frame. The hinge joint is positioned on one of the longer sides of the inner and outer frames. The at least one hinge joint moves on a straight line.

Abstract (de)

Ein Wechselrahmen, insbesondere für Bilder, Dokumente oder dergleichen, welcher einen an einer festen Fläche anbringbaren Innenrahmen (2) und einen Außenrahmen (3) aufweist. Der Wechselrahmen ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass der Innenrahmen (2) und der Außenrahmen (3) miteinander über mindestens eine Gelenkverbindung (4) verbunden sind, wobei die Gelenkverbindung (4) so ausgelegt ist, daß der Außenrahmen (3) relativ zum Innenrahmen (2) klappbar ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 1/06 (2006.01); G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/0018 (2013.01); A47G 1/06 (2013.01); A47G 1/0611 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238607 A2 20020911; EP 1238607 A3 20030924; DE 10111482 A1 20020919; DE 10111482 B4 20040527

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-07-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI