Global Patent Index - EP 1238622 A2

EP 1238622 A2 2002-09-11 - Dishwasher with a rotatable spraying device and controlling device therefor

Title (en)

Dishwasher with a rotatable spraying device and controlling device therefor

Title (de)

Geschirrspülmaschine mit einer drehbar gelagerten Sprüheinrichtung und Steuerverfahren hierfür

Title (fr)

Lave-vaiselle avec dispositif d'arrosage monté tournant et procédé de commande pour celui-ci

Publication

EP 1238622 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01130767 A

Priority

DE 10111533 A

Abstract (en)

The dishwasher comprises a control unit (5) with which the angular velocity of rotation of the spray mechanism (1) is adjustable with angle dependence. The control unit controls a circulating pump (6) which feeds an adjustable rinsing liquid quantity to the spray mechanism. The dishwasher has a position sensor (4) which registers the position of the spray unit and sends a position signal to the control unit. An Independent claim is also included for the control method of the dishwasher.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Geschirrspülmaschine mit einer drehbar gelagerten Sprüheinrichtung (1). Erfindungsgemäß wird eine Steuereinrichtung vorgesehen, mit der die Winkelgeschwindigkeit der Drehung der Sprüheinrichtung (1) winkelabhängig einstellbar ist. Während des Umlaufs der Sprüheinrichtung kann dadurch die Spülflüssigkeitsmenge einstellbar in vorgegebene Richtung erhöht abgestrahlt und somit in diesem Bereich die Reinigungswirkung verbessert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/23 (2013.01); A47L 15/4289 (2013.01); A47L 2401/24 (2013.01); A47L 2501/03 (2013.01); A47L 2501/05 (2013.01); A47L 2501/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238622 A2 20020911; EP 1238622 A3 20030319; EP 1238622 B1 20100210; DE 10111533 A1 20020912; DE 50115338 D1 20100325

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101222

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50115338

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101222

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100210

2011-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101111

2010-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50115338 P 20100325

2010-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2010-02-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI