Global Patent Index - EP 1238686 A1

EP 1238686 A1 2002-09-11 - Ski mountaineering kit

Title (en)

Ski mountaineering kit

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Skibergsteigen

Title (fr)

Kit pour ski de randonnée

Publication

EP 1238686 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01830157 A

Priority

EP 01830157 A

Abstract (en)

A ski mountaineering kit (1) including a ski mountaineering boot (2), which can be used together with a ski mountaineering clamp assembly (6) having a front clamp (7) for the toe (15) of the boot (2), and a rear clamp (8) for the heel (18) of the boot (2). The boot (2) has a flexible portion (21) extending crosswise to the shell (12), close to the toe (15) and at the metatarsusphalanx articulation; and the kit (1) also includes a supporting device (3) attachable to the ski (4), behind and close to the front clamp (7), so as to be located, in use, beneath the flexible portion (21) of the boot (2) to prevent deformation of the flexible portion when the boot (2) is secured to both clamps (7, 8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/20; A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A63C 9/20 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/20 (2013.01); A43B 5/0413 (2013.01); A43B 5/0421 (2013.01); A43B 5/0472 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238686 A1 20020911; EP 1238686 B1 20051109; AT 309034 T 20051115; DE 60114762 D1 20051215; DE 60114762 T2 20060601

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170331

2018-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170331

2018-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170308

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171003

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-12-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171130

2017-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 309034 T

- Effective date: 20170308

2017-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60114762

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170310

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160315

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHNEIDER FELDMANN AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60114762 P 20051215

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040914

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030310

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI