Global Patent Index - EP 1238710 A1

EP 1238710 A1 2002-09-11 - Powder spraying device and powder coating process

Title (en)

Powder spraying device and powder coating process

Title (de)

Pulverzerstäuber und Pulverbeschichtungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Appareil de projection de poudre et procédé pour revêtement par poudre

Publication

EP 1238710 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02004870 A

Priority

  • DE 10111209 A
  • US 5345501 A

Abstract (en)

The powder may be introduced through a central pipe (6) with a square-cut end. Additional air (30) passes through a tube or shaft (3) concentrically-surrounding the central pipe. The pipe is surrounded by an air turbine (2) which rotates it and rotates the spray bell (4). The mixture of air and powder passes through a channel (14) between the outer (8) and inner (12) parts of the bell. There is a wide inner channel (21) in the center of the inner part of the bell which accommodates an adjustable conical tip (22).

Abstract (de)

In einem Pulverzerstäuber für die Serienbeschichtung von Werkstücken wird in den Weg (14) des aus dem Pulverkanal (6) des Zerstäubers austretenden Pulver-Luftgemisches aus einem separaten Kanal (30) zusätzliche Luft geleitet, die bei der Beschichtung zur Beeinflussung und Änderung des Gemisches verwendet werden kann und in Beschichtungspausen als Spülluft zum Reinigen des beispielsweise durch eine Zerstäuberglocke (4) führenden Pulverweges dient. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/14; B05B 5/03; B05B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/04 (2006.01); B05B 3/10 (2006.01); B05B 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/1064 (2013.01); B05B 5/0407 (2013.01); B05B 5/0418 (2013.01); B05B 3/1092 (2013.01); B05B 5/0426 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238710 A1 20020911; EP 1238710 B1 20060906; AT 338585 T 20060915; DE 50208039 D1 20061019; ES 2269534 T3 20070401; US 2003080206 A1 20030501; US 2005001056 A1 20050106; US 6913214 B2 20050705

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DUERR SYSTEMS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DUERR SYSTEMS AG, 74321 BIETIGHEIM-BISSINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50208039

2017-03-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50208039

- Representative's name: V. BEZOLD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE - PARTG MBB, DE

2016-09-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DUERR SYSTEMS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DUERR SYSTEMS GMBH, 74321 BIETIGHEIM-BISSINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50208039

2016-09-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50208039

- Representative's name: V. BEZOLD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE - PARTG MBB, DE

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060906

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060906

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070304

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070304

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061207

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-08-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070607

2007-04-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2269534 T3

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070219

2006-12-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061129

2006-12-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061206

2006-10-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50208039 P 20061019

2006-10-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-09-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-09-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060906

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI