Global Patent Index - EP 1238711 A2

EP 1238711 A2 2002-09-11 - Internal burner

Title (en)

Internal burner

Title (de)

Innenbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur intérieur

Publication

EP 1238711 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02003519 A

Priority

DE 10111565 A

Abstract (en)

The electric arc device is used for spraying the inside surface of a cylindrical pipe. It has two pipes (1) carrying process gases. If two gases are used, they mix in a nozzle section (2) which has a large opening at right-angles to the gas pipes. Two gas pipes containing wire electrodes for the arc (3) are situated in the opening for the escaping process gases the ends may taper at an angle of 30 degrees. The tips of the electrodes are inclined toward each other and a cap with a small nozzle opening may be placed over the large opening.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Innenbrenner zum Lichtbogendrahtspritzen von Hohlräumen, insbesondere von Zylinderlaufflächen. Der Innenbrenner weist mindestens zwei Brennerrohre (3) zur Zuführung von Elektroden auf. Die Elektroden sind zur Aufschmelzung vorgesehen und als in einem Lichtbogen abbrennbare Drähte ausgebildet. Der Innenbrenner weist ferner eine Gaszuführung (1) für ein Prozessgas auf, welches zum Transport und Zerstäuben des aufgeschmolzenen Drahtmaterials in Richtung der zu beschichtenden Oberfläche des Hohlraumes vorgesehen ist. Die Drähte sind durch die Brennerrohre austrittsseitig und im Bereich des Lichtbogens aufeinander zu geführt, wobei der im Berührungsbereich der Drähte angeordnete Lichtbogen der Elektroden-Drähte im Bereich des Gasstromes des ausgetretenen Prozessgases angeordnet ist, und wobei der Gasstrom des ausgetretenen Prozessgases, im folgenden vereinfachen Hauptgasrichtung genannt, quer zur Haupttransportrichtung der Drähte angeordnet ist. Des weiteren sind die Drähte außer aufeinander zu noch zusätzlich quer dazu gebogen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 13/06; B05B 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/22 (2006.01); B05B 13/06 (2006.01); C23C 4/131 (2016.01); C23C 4/16 (2016.01); H05H 1/32 (2006.01); H05H 1/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/224 (2013.01); B05B 13/0627 (2013.01); C23C 4/131 (2016.01); C23C 4/16 (2013.01); H05H 1/32 (2013.01); H05H 1/42 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19841617 A1 20000323 - DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238711 A2 20020911; EP 1238711 A3 20060201; EP 1238711 B1 20081112; DE 10111565 A1 20020926; DE 10111565 C2 20030130; DE 10111565 C5 20050721; DE 50212998 D1 20081224; JP 2002322552 A 20021108; JP 3496012 B2 20040209; US 2002130109 A1 20020919; US 6667460 B2 20031223

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090813

2008-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212998 P 20081224

2008-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-12-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER AG

2007-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2006-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060119

2006-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-02-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI