Global Patent Index - EP 1238713 A1

EP 1238713 A1 2002-09-11 - Method of sealing a scarf joint

Title (en)

Method of sealing a scarf joint

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Abdichten einer Falzverbindung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour rendre étanche un assemblage à rainure

Publication

EP 1238713 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01130056 A

Priority

DE 10109551 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10109551A1] An edge-raised seam (4) is sealed by a sealant layer of a heat-sealed material. The seam is heated by induction (5) to gel temperature, a sealant layer (8) is applied and pre-gelled by further heat treatment. The seam is continuously heated locally before the layer is applied, and the second heat treatment is by capacitive high frequency field.

Abstract (de)

Es ist allgemein bekannt, Falzverbindungen an Blechen durch eine Versiegelungsschicht gegen Korrosion abzudichten. Hierbei wird die Versiegelungsschicht auf die erwärmte Bördelnaht aufgetragen. Um hierbei Bauteilverzug zu vermeiden, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, die Bördelnaht fortlaufend vor dem Auftrag der Versiegelungsschicht lokal zu erwärmen und das eigentliche Vorgelieren mittels einer zweiten Wärmebehandlung mittels eines Hochfrequenzfeldes durchzuführen. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 1/26; B05D 3/02; B05D 3/14; B29C 65/00; B60J 10/00; B62D 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62D 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/14 (2013.01); B05C 5/0216 (2013.01); B05D 3/0245 (2013.01); B05D 3/0281 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238713 A1 20020911; EP 1238713 B1 20030827; DE 10109551 A1 20020905; ES 2204799 T3 20040501

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091219

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-04-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110406

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091218

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091218

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091218

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081211

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081224

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204799 T3

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100549 P 20031002

2003-10-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-09-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI