Global Patent Index - EP 1238723 A2

EP 1238723 A2 2002-09-11 - Device for bending plates

Title (en)

Device for bending plates

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Abkanten von Blechen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour plier des plaques

Publication

EP 1238723 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02002739 A

Priority

DE 10111134 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10111134C1] The edge zone (14) of the sheet to be folded is clamped between the upper and lower dies and a shaping edge bends the plate along the folding line. The shaping edge swings on a rotating body (4) in a housing (5), so that the straight closing movement of the press is converted into a swing movement at the folding edge. The movement of the lower die is also converted into a swing motion, to swing the shaping edge.

Abstract (de)

Um beim Abkanten von Blechen auch Bleche (13) abkanten zu können, bei denen die Formbacke nicht gleichmäßig an der Biegelinie angreifen kann, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, die Formbacke (4.1) in einem Gehäuse verschwenkbar zu führen und zwar derart, dass eine Abkantung um die Biegelinie möglich ist. Dies wird dadurch erreicht, dass die Formbacke (4.1) in einer Führung in einem Gehäuse (5) geführt ist und von einem über Hydraulikzylinder betätigbaren Schlitten über eine Rolle und eine an der Formbacke (4.1) befestigten Hebel (6) verschwenkt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 5/04; B21D 19/08; B21D 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/04 (2006.01); B21D 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/042 (2013.01); B21D 5/04 (2013.01); B21D 19/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 10111134 C1 20020704; DE 50211177 D1 20071227; EP 1238723 A2 20020911; EP 1238723 A3 20040107; EP 1238723 B1 20071114; ES 2292650 T3 20080316

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150208

2016-03-31 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150207

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150207

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150207

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50211177

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140120

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 20100127

2010-02-26 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2010-02-05 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2008-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080815

2008-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2292650 T3

2007-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211177 P 20071227

2007-12-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071114

2007-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-11-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR BENDING PLATES

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061205

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040117

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21D 5/04 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21D 19/08 B

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21D 39/02 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI