Global Patent Index - EP 1238724 A1

EP 1238724 A1 2002-09-11 - Integral rivet for fastening two parts as well as its manufacturing method and device

Title (en)

Integral rivet for fastening two parts as well as its manufacturing method and device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Befestigen zweier Teile sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen einer solchen Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Rivet intégral pour assembler deux pièces ainsi que son procédé et dispositif de fabrication

Publication

EP 1238724 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02004605 A

Priority

DE 10111013 A

Abstract (en)

The fixing device connects two parts, one of which is a sheet (1) or plate of non-ferrous metal such as aluminum or an aluminum alloy. A rivet (2) is formed from the material of this sheet. There is an annular groove (7), of reduced thickness compared to the initial material. Fins (11) in the region of this groove project over it.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung sieht eine Befestigungsvorrichtung zum Verbinden zweier Teile, von denen eines ein Blech (1) aus Leichtmetall oder einer Leichtmetalllegierung, wie Aluminium oder einer Aluminiumplatte ist, bei der aus dem Material ein Niet (2) ausgebildet ist, welcher von einer Ringnut (7) gegenüber der Ausgangsmaterialstärke verminderter Stärke gebildet ist vor, dass im Bereich der Ringnut (7) diese überragend Rippen (11) ausgebildet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 22/04; B21D 51/38; B21J 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/04 (2006.01); B21D 39/03 (2006.01); B21J 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/032 (2013.01); B21D 22/04 (2013.01); B21J 15/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238724 A1 20020911; EP 1238724 B1 20070606; DE 10111013 A1 20020912; DE 50210252 D1 20070719

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50210252

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110301

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080307

2007-11-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070808

2007-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210252 P 20070719

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-06-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KERN, NORBERT

2007-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLEEMANN, MARTIN

2007-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOEFER, EDWIN

2007-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WINDISCH, ARNOLD

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050825

2006-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050825

2006-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EICHENAUER HEIZELEMENTE GMBH & CO. KG

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030109

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KERN, NORBERT

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLEEMANN, MARTIN

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOEFER, ERWIN

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WINDISCH, ARNOLD

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI