Global Patent Index - EP 1238727 A2

EP 1238727 A2 2002-09-11 - Process for manufacturing metallic strip having differing material properties through their section

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing metallic strip having differing material properties through their section

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von metallischen Bändern mit Abschnitten unterschiedlicher Materialeigenschaften

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de bandes métalliques comportant des propriétés de matériaux différents à travers la section

Publication

EP 1238727 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02002748 A

Priority

DE 10107027 A

Abstract (en)

Production of metallic strips (B) having sections of different material properties comprises: (i) melting a low alloyed or micro-alloyed steel; (ii) casting the steel in the casting gap (2) formed between walls of a casting machine (1); and (iii) cooling the cast strip. The force (G1, G2) exerted on the strip in the casting gap and measured over the width of the strip is more than 100 kN/m. Preferred Features: The steel contains (in wt.%) 0.01-0.80 C, 0.30-5.00 Mn, ≤ 0.50 Cr, ≤ 0.10 Al, ≤ 0.80 Si, ≤ 0.05 Ti, ≤ 0.05 Nb, ≤ 0.05 Nb, ≤ 0.01 N, ≤ 0.02 S, ≤ 0.02 P, ≤ 0.2 Ni, ≤ 0.1 Mo, ≤ 0.1 W and a balance iron and unavoidable impurities. The casting machine is a two roller casting machine. The force exerted on the strip in the casting gap and measured over the width of the strip is at least 200 kN/m.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von metallischen Bändern (B) mit Abschnitten (S1 - S5) unterschiedlicher Materialeigenschaften umfassend folgende Schritte: Erschmelzen eines niedriglegierten oder mikrolegierten Stahls, Vergießen des Stahls im zwischen bewegten Wänden einer Gießmaschine (1) ausgebildeten Gießspalt (2) zu einem gegossenen Band (B), wobei die im Gießspalt (2) auf das Band (B) ausgeübte, über die Breite des Bandes (B) gemessene Kraft (G1,G2) mehr als 100 kN/m beträgt, und Abkühlen des gegossenen Bandes (B). Das erfindungsgemäße Verfahren ermöglicht es, eine kostengünstige Herstellung von Metallband zu schaffen, das eine hinsichtlich seiner späteren Verwendung optimierte Verteilung seiner Materialeigenschaften aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06; B22D 11/00; B22D 11/124

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/06 (2006.01); B22D 11/124 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0622 (2013.01); B22D 11/00 (2013.01); B22D 11/124 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238727 A2 20020911; EP 1238727 A3 20030122; EP 1238727 B1 20041208; AT 284284 T 20041215; DE 10107027 A1 20020912; ES 2234937 T3 20050701

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100207

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100207

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100207

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080208

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080208

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *THYSSENKRUPP STAHL A.G.

- Effective date: 20080228

2007-03-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070312

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2234937 T3

2005-05-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201702 P 20050113

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030125

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL AG

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI