Global Patent Index - EP 1238758 A1

EP 1238758 A1 2002-09-11 - Assisting device for mounting a fastening clip

Title (en)

Assisting device for mounting a fastening clip

Title (de)

Hilfsvorrichtung zum Montieren einer Befestigungsklammer

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'aide au montage d'une agrafe de fixation

Publication

EP 1238758 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290581 A

Priority

FR 0103222 A

Abstract (en)

The tool, designed to fit a spring fastening clip onto a pin (5) e.g. to hold a heat screen or other component in place, consists of a guide (2) to receive the clip (4), and an inner pusher (7) on the end of a rod (1). The pusher has two separate pressure zones (11, 12) that interact with the two arms of the clip, forcing the central hole in the base of the clip over the pin and allowing the arms to grip the pin when released.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif d'aide au montage, qui comporte au moins un moyen de production d'une force de poussée et au moins un moyen de transmission de ladite force de poussée vers une extrémité munie d'un embout, d'une agrafe de fixation (4), constituée d'au moins une base, au centre de laquelle est ménagé un orifice (10) destiné à recevoir un axe de montage (5), et à partir de laquelle s'étendent deux bras (8) et (9) dont les extrémités libres s'étendent sensiblement au-dessus dudit orifice (10), caractérisé en ce que le poussoir (7) comporte au moins deux zones de pression distinctes (11) et (12) qui coopèrent respectivement avec les bras (8) et (9) de l'agrafe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 31/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238758 A1 20020911; EP 1238758 B1 20081231; DE 60230555 D1 20090212; ES 2316532 T3 20090416; FR 2821781 A1 20020913; FR 2821781 B1 20030606

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60230555

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-12-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2316532 T3

2009-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60230555 P 20090212

2008-12-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI