Global Patent Index - EP 1238761 A1

EP 1238761 A1 2002-09-11 - Balanced Rotary power tool

Title (en)

Balanced Rotary power tool

Title (de)

Ausbalanciertes und rotierendes Kraftwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil équilibré à mouvement rotatif motorisé

Publication

EP 1238761 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01115972 A

Priority

US 80205001 A

Abstract (en)

A hand-held rotary power tool (10) includes a housing (11) with a top portion (12), a handle portion (13), and a bottom portion (14) arranged into a relatively T-shaped configuration. A motor (22) is located within the bottom portion (14) of the housing (11). An input shaft (21) extends from the motor (22) through the handle portion (13) and rotatively couples the motor (22) to a gear box (20) located in the top portion (12) of the housing (11). An output shaft (24) extends forwardly from the gear box (20) at an angle that is substantially perpendicular to the longitudinal axis of the input shaft (21), and is coupled to a chuck (15) for rotation thereof. The tool (10) is balanced to inhibit rotation in the plane of the input and output shafts (21,24), in use. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 21/00 (2006.01); B25F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238761 A1 20020911; CN 100346936 C 20071107; CN 1373027 A 20021009; JP 2002264042 A 20020918; TW M248576 U 20041101

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060720

2004-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SNAP-ON INCORPORATED

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SNAP-ON INCORPORATED

2004-08-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SNAP-ON INCORPORATED

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030310

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI