Global Patent Index - EP 1238768 A2

EP 1238768 A2 2002-09-11 - Mould for making prefabricated walls

Title (en)

Mould for making prefabricated walls

Title (de)

Form zur Herstellung von vorgefertigten Wänden

Title (fr)

Moule pour la fabrication de murs prefabriqués

Publication

EP 1238768 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02380030 A

Priority

ES 200100557 U

Abstract (en)

It comprises a frame defining a cavity adapted to receive concrete mass and reinforced concrete. The frame is formed by a horizontal bottom (1), side walls (2, 3), end walls (4, 5) and means (6) for collapsing said walls (2, 3, 4, 5) relative to said bottom (1) comprising shafts (8) arranged parallel to said walls (2, 3, 4, 5) the ends of which pass through a plate (9) welded to the above mentioned horizontal bottom (1) and a plate (10) welded to the wall (2, 3, 4, 5) of the mould frame. There are provided locking means for locking walls (2, 3, 4, 5) relative to the bottom (1) comprising pins (14) received within holes (11, 13) formed in the plate (9) and in a plate (12) welded to said walls (2, 3, 4, 5), preventing them from being collapsed relative to the mould bottom (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/0044 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238768 A2 20020911; EP 1238768 A3 20040114; ES 1048532 U 20010901; ES 1048532 Y 20011216

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050819

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT PT

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040706

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI