Global Patent Index - EP 1238769 A2

EP 1238769 A2 2002-09-11 - Mould for making articles

Title (en)

Mould for making articles

Title (de)

Form zur Herstellung von Formkörpern

Title (fr)

Moule pour la fabrication d'articles

Publication

EP 1238769 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02002733 A

Priority

DE 10110651 A

Abstract (en)

Swivel-mounted mold cores (9) protrude into the voids (2) in the molds (1) and are moved in and out by at least one cavity (10) in one or more of the mold-walls (3) or in the mold-base. Between the inner edge of the cavity and the outline of the mold-core is an air gap causing the edge to act as scraper. The mold cores are swivel mounted on a horizontal axis (13)on the outside of the mold. Each mold core consists of a cylinder-segment-shaped body with triangular end surfaces.

Abstract (de)

Die Seitenwände (3) der Form (1) weisen Aussparungen (10) auf, in denen jeweils ein Formkern (9) zur Anbringung von Vertiefungen (7) an den Aussenseiten eines mit dieser Form hergestellten Betonformsteines angeordnet ist. Die Formkerne (9) sind um eine horizontale, parallel zu den Formwänden verlaufende Schwenkachse (13) an den Aussenseiten der Form schwenkbar gelagert. Über einen Schwenkantrieb (19,20), der beispielsweise aus einer Schrägschlitzsteuerung besteht, sind die Formkerne (9) durch die Aussparung (10) hindurch in das durch die Formwände (3) begrenzte Formnest (2) hinein- und zurückschwenkbar. Dabei dienen die inneren Begrenzungskanten der Aussparung (10) als Abstreifer, die beim Zurückschwenken des Formkerns (9) eine Selbstreinigung aller mit dem Beton in Berührung gekommenen Flächen des Formkerns bewirken. Dadurch werden die Zeitintervalle für die Reinigung der Formkerne erheblich verlängert und eine saubere und glatte Oberfläche des fertigen Betonformsteines (5) gewährleistet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 7/30; E01C 5/06; E04B 2/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/303 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238769 A2 20020911; EP 1238769 A3 20040121; CA 2363998 A1 20020906; DE 10110651 A1 20020912; DE 20122914 U1 20091001; US 2002125403 A1 20020912; US 6843461 B2 20050118

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050326

2005-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041210

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 28B 7/30 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04B 2/08 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01C 5/06 B

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOBRA FORMEN GMBH

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI