Global Patent Index - EP 1238802 A1

EP 1238802 A1 2002-09-11 - Fountain solution supply system

Title (en)

Fountain solution supply system

Title (de)

Feuchtmittel-Zufuhrsystem

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation de solution de mouillage

Publication

EP 1238802 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02004480 A

Priority

DE 10111614 A

Abstract (en)

The moisturizer supply system includes at least one transfer roll (18) which is moisturized and transfers the moisture to other rolls (12, 14, 16), and eventually to a platen cylinder (10), and an applicator border (20) running parallel to this roll. At least one of the moisturized rolls is/are from the transfer roll to the platen cylinder and/or the applicator border.

Abstract (de)

Ein Feuchtmittel-Zufuhrsystem für den Offset-Druck umfaßt wenigstens eine Übertragungswalze (18) zur Aufnahme von Feuchtmittel auf der Oberfläche und Übertragung auf weitere Walzen bis zu einem Plattenzylinder (10), und eine parallel zu und entlang der Übertragungswalze (18) verlaufende Auftragsleiste (20) zum Aufbringen des Feuchtmittels auf die Oberfläche der Übertragungswalze. Wenigstens eine der Feuchtwerkswalzen (12,14,16,18) von der Übertragungswalze (18) bis zum Plattenzylinder (10) und/oder die Auftragsleiste (20) ist/sind gekühlt. Die Kühlung des Feuchtmittels im Feuchtwerk ermöglicht es, das Feuchtmittel unmittelbar nach der Zusammensetzung aus Wasser, Alkohol und Zusatzbestandteilen ohne weitere Konditionierung und Kühlung in einem Feuchtwerkstank dem Feuchtwerk zuzuführen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 29716582 U1 19971106 - TECHNOTRANS GMBH [DE]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 002 (M - 049) 9 January 1981 (1981-01-09)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238802 A1 20020911; EP 1238802 B1 20081022; DE 10111614 A1 20020919; DE 10111614 B4 20040212; DE 50212923 D1 20081204

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160227

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160227

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140227

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-02-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090723

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090202

2008-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212923 P 20081204

2008-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2008-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060315

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI