Global Patent Index - EP 1238803 A1

EP 1238803 A1 2002-09-11 - Method for cleaning a roller

Title (en)

Method for cleaning a roller

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Reinigen einer Walze

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé permettant de nettoyer un rouleau

Publication

EP 1238803 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02012661 A

Priority

  • DE 19860857 A
  • EP 99967899 A

Abstract (en)

The cleaning device for a roll (04) or cylinder of a rotary printing press includes at least one rotating cleaning element (13, 14, 16, 17) and cleaning fluid. There is an outlet aperture (26) for the fluid inside the rotating cleaning element. The cleaning fluid may also be introduced into the rotating cleaning element. There may be an outlet aperture for a separator which can be varied in position axially along the roll.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Reinigen von Walzen (04) und dgl. wird nach dem Reinigen ein Trennmittel zum Trennen von Farbe von der Walze aufgebracht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2013.01); B41P 2235/23 (2013.01); B41P 2235/26 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19860857 A1 20000706; EP 1140507 A1 20011010; EP 1140507 B1 20030514; EP 1238803 A1 20020911; EP 1238803 B1 20050525; WO 0040415 A1 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2006-12-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061204

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060228

2005-06-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912102 P 20050630

2005-05-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1140507 P

2005-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-09-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1140507

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE