Global Patent Index - EP 1238814 A1

EP 1238814 A1 2002-09-11 - Ink-jet printer equipped for aligning the printheads

Title (en)

Ink-jet printer equipped for aligning the printheads

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldrucker ausgestattet zum Ausrichten von Druckköpfe

Title (fr)

Imprimante à jet d'encre équipée pour aligner ses têtes d'impression

Publication

EP 1238814 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02100131 A

Priority

  • EP 02100131 A
  • EP 01000045 A

Abstract (en)

An ink-jet printer includes pagewidth printheads (104) mounted in a frame (101), wherein the printheads are coupled to mechanical devices (106, 107) for aligning the printheads with respect to each other, with respect to an edge of the image receiving substrate (100), or with respect to both. The printer may include devices (114, 115, 116,117, 118) for sensing the possible misalignment, coupled to a computer for automatically aligning the printheads. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 29/393; B41J 2/155; B41J 2/21; B41J 2/51

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/155 (2006.01); B41J 2/21 (2006.01); B41J 2/515 (2006.01); B41J 29/393 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 25/005 (2013.01); B41J 2/155 (2013.01); B41J 2/2135 (2013.01); B41J 2/515 (2013.01); B41J 29/393 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238814 A1 20020911; EP 1238814 B1 20031203

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090213

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090213

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080116

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080117

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-11-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-08-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60200107 P 20040115

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI