Global Patent Index - EP 1238815 A2

EP 1238815 A2 2002-09-11 - Ink jet recording element and printing method

Title (en)

Ink jet recording element and printing method

Title (de)

Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsmedium und Zeichnungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Matériau pour l'impression a jet d'encre et procédé d'impression

Publication

EP 1238815 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02075736 A

Priority

  • US 79993301 A
  • US 79993201 A

Abstract (en)

An ink jet recording element and printing method using the element, comprising a support having thereon a porous image-receiving layer comprising particles in a binder, the particles having a primary particle size of from 7 to 40 nm in diameter which may be aggregated up to 300 nm, the image-receiving layer being coated from an acidic aqueous dispersion, and the recording element containing a subbing layer between the support and the porous image-receiving layer, the subbing layer comprising a basic material which is capable of raising the surface pH of the image-receiving layer at least 2 pH units.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/506 (2013.01); B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 2205/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238815 A2 20020911; EP 1238815 A3 20031119; JP 2002331746 A 20021119

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040520

2004-09-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI