Global Patent Index - EP 1238879 A2

EP 1238879 A2 2002-09-11 - Installation for carrying people from a higher station down to a lower station

Title (en)

Installation for carrying people from a higher station down to a lower station

Title (de)

Anlage zum Abfahren von Personen von einer Bergstation in eine Talstation

Title (fr)

Installation pour circulation des personnes en descente d'une station haute vers une station basse

Publication

EP 1238879 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01890321 A

Priority

AT 3582001 A

Abstract (en)

The system to carry people away from a mountain station to a valley station has guide rails (4) suspended from supports (1-3) over the ground. The separate rail sections are linked together without sliding. The guide rails are held by guides (31), at least at a part of the supports, which swing around a vertical axis. When at rest, the rail sections (41,42) have a consistent sag, like a chain.

Abstract (de)

Anlage zum Abfahren von Personen von einer Bergstation in eine Talstation längs einer von Stützen (1, 2, 3) od.dgl. im Abstand vom Boden getragenen Führungsschiene (4). Dabei sind die einzelnen Abschnitte der Führungsschiene miteinander gelenkig und unverschiebbar verbunden und ist die Führungsschiene (4) an zumindest einem Teil der Stützen (1, 2, 3) od.dgl. jeweils mittels eines um eine angenähert vertikale Achse verschwenkbaren Lenkers (31) befestigt (Fig.1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 7/00; B61B 3/00; B61B 12/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 25/24 (2006.01); B61B 1/00 (2006.01); B61B 3/00 (2006.01); B61B 7/00 (2006.01); B61B 11/00 (2006.01); B61B 12/02 (2006.01); B61B 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 3/00 (2013.01); B61B 7/00 (2013.01); B61B 12/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1026061 A2 20000809 - INNOVA PATENT GMBH [AT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238879 A2 20020911; EP 1238879 A3 20030319; EP 1238879 B1 20040121; AT 258126 T 20040215; AT 409952 B 20021227; AT A3582001 A 20020515; AU 1679602 A 20020912; BR 0200552 A 20021210; CA 2372372 A1 20020907; CA 2372372 C 20070515; CN 1272205 C 20060830; CN 1374220 A 20021016; DE 50101355 D1 20040226; DK 1238879 T3 20040216; ES 2211761 T3 20040716; JP 2002317401 A 20021031; JP 3823059 B2 20060920; KR 100799379 B1 20080130; KR 20020071729 A 20020913; NO 20020821 A 20020909; NO 20020821 D0 20020219; NZ 517305 A 20020628; PL 196917 B1 20080229; PL 352347 A1 20020909; PT 1238879 E 20040430; RU 2002102421 A 20030927; US 2002124762 A1 20020912; US 6644207 B2 20031111

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091116

2010-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211761 T3

2004-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-03-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040400465

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101355 P 20040226

2004-02-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-21 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2003-12-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI