Global Patent Index - EP 1238905 A2

EP 1238905 A2 2002-09-11 - System for cleaning a ship side

Title (en)

System for cleaning a ship side

Title (de)

System zum Reinigen einer Seite eines Schiffes

Title (fr)

Système pour nettoyer un flanc d'un bateau

Publication

EP 1238905 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02075763 A

Priority

NL 1017498 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a pump unit (1) and a cleaning head (2) connected to the pump unit (1), for cleaning a ship side (4) of a ship which is placed on a wharf or in a dry-dock (5). During cleaning, the cleaning head (2) is manually moved back and forth along the ship side (4), while the pump unit (1) supplies the cleaning head (2) with a cleaning liquid under high pressure and at the same time drains away cleaning liquid with fouling, removed from the ship side. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 59/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 1/04 (2006.01); B08B 3/02 (2006.01); B63B 59/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 59/06 (2013.01); B08B 1/04 (2013.01); B08B 3/024 (2013.01); B08B 2203/0229 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238905 A2 20020911; EP 1238905 A3 20031105; NL 1017498 C1 20020906

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050920

2004-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOAT DRYDOCK SYSTEMS

2004-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BORSBOOM, DIRK

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040713

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI