Global Patent Index - EP 1238911 A1

EP 1238911 A1 2002-09-11 - Filling head for filling containers with a fluid substance

Title (en)

Filling head for filling containers with a fluid substance

Title (de)

Füllkopf zum Füllen von Behältern mit einem fluidförmigen Medium

Title (fr)

Tête de remplissage pour remplir des récipients en produit fluide

Publication

EP 1238911 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02003985 A

Priority

  • DE 10110932 A
  • DE 20103988 U
  • DE 10115452 A
  • DE 20106269 U

Abstract (en)

Filling head (10) comprises a piston (60) which moves relative to the filling head between a first closing position and a second opening position. The piston is pretensioned using a spring (64) in its first closing position. The head has a first bearing region (52) for an element of a container to be filled. The head is constructed so that a gap remains between the bearing region of the piston in its first closing position and an upper side of a valve dome. Preferred Features: The filling head is essentially cylindrical. The bearing region of the head has an annular surface extending about a longitudinal axis.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Füllkopf (10), insbesondere einen Sicherheits-Schnellfüllkopf, zum Füllen von Behältern (80) mit einem fließfähigen Medium. Auf die Öffnung eines Behälters (80) ist ein Ventilteller (82) aufgesetzt, der ein Abgabeventil (100) umfaßt. Der Ventilteller (82) wird mittels Clinchen an dem Behälter (80) befestigt. Der Füllkopf (10) ist so konstruiert, daß ein Füllen des Behälters (80) vermieden wird, wenn der Füllkopf (10) auf einen fehlerhaften Behälter (80) aufgesetzt wird, bei dem der Ventilteller (82) oder das Abgabeventil (100) nicht vorschriftsmäßig mittels Clinchen an dem Behälter (80) befestigt ist. Die Erfindung betrifft ferner ein Verfahren zum Füllen von Behältern (80) mit einem fluidförmigen Medium, wobei ein nichtgewünschtes Füllen von fehlerhaften Behältern (80) vermieden wird, bei denen der Ventilteller (82) oder das Abgabeventil nicht vorschriftsmäßig mittels Clinchen an dem Behälter (80) befestigt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 31/00; B65B 57/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 3/12 (2006.01); B65B 31/00 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/425 (2013.01); B65B 3/12 (2013.01); B65B 31/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] US 3103956 A 19630917 - RICHARD FOCHT JOHN

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20103988 U1 20010712; AT 253497 T 20031115; DE 10115452 A1 20020926; DE 10115452 B4 20070621; DE 20106269 U1 20011206; DK 1238911 T3 20040308; EP 1238911 A1 20020911; EP 1238911 B1 20031105; TR 200302318 T4 20040322

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR DORTMUND GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SEAQUIST PERFECT DISPENSING GMBH, 44319 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 50200089

- Effective date: 20130611

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50200089

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20130611

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50200089

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20121220

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50200089

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130611

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50200089

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20121220

2013-06-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50200089

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2013-01-11 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR DORTMUND GMBH

- Effective date: 20121213

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50200089

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040405

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SEAQUIST PERFECT DISPENSING GMBH

- Free text: SEAQUIST PERFECT DISPENSING GMBH#HILDEBRANDSTRASSE 20#44319 DORTMUND (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SEAQUIST PERFECT DISPENSING GMBH#HILDEBRANDSTRASSE 20#44319 DORTMUND (DE)

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040223

2004-03-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-02-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040205

2003-12-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200089 P 20031211

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-05 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI