Global Patent Index - EP 1238918 A1

EP 1238918 A1 2002-09-11 - POURING STOPPER FOR VISCOUS LIQUIDS

Title (en)

POURING STOPPER FOR VISCOUS LIQUIDS

Title (de)

AUSGIESSVERSCHLUSS FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITEN HOHER VISKOSITÄT

Title (fr)

BOUCHON VERSEUR POUR LIQUIDES VISQUEUX

Publication

EP 1238918 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00948026 A

Priority

  • ES 0000275 W
  • ES 9902598 A

Abstract (en)

The cap has a body which can be coupled in a fixed manner to the neck of the bottle for containing the liquid, and which optionally has means for regularising the discharge of the stream of liquid and a seal which can be torn off, and also an upper lid having a closing cover, being characterised by the formation in the cap of a pouring spout having an end outlet of small cross-section for permitting the use of the cap both for pouring the liquid contained in the receptacle directly by way of the main opening thereof or for fine metered pouring by means of the pouring spout. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/08 (2006.01); B65D 47/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/043 (2013.01); B65D 47/0823 (2013.01); B65D 47/088 (2013.01); B65D 47/103 (2013.01); B65D 2251/1041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0138190A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238918 A1 20020911; AU 6161800 A 20010604; RU 2002116662 A 20040227; TR 200201401 T2 20021121; WO 0138190 A1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-12-06 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2002-11-13 [REG GR PP] EP - PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: GR 20020300055

2002-09-18 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020517

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020517

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI