Global Patent Index - EP 1238919 A1

EP 1238919 A1 2002-09-11 - Closure device for preventing the refilling of a bottle with a collar sleeve

Title (en)

Closure device for preventing the refilling of a bottle with a collar sleeve

Title (de)

Verschlusssystem zur Verhütung der abermaligen Füllung einer Flasche mit Bund am Hals

Title (fr)

Système de fermeture pour empêcher le reremplissage d'une bouteille avec manchon au col

Publication

EP 1238919 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02003150 A

Priority

RU 2001105500 A

Abstract (en)

Invention relates to sealing devices of bottles containing expensive liquids to preclude re-filling and stealing. Said safety stopper has pour-out device with tube, cap, shutoff bushing, gasket with valve. Pour-out device made of hard plastic is provided with locks on tube and segment cuts between locks on tube wall. Shutoff bushing has tearoff ring connected with main part of shutoff bushing by inclined bridges provided with slots. Places of attachment of bridges on shell are displaced relative to tearoff ring latches.

Abstract (de)

Veschlußsystem zur Verhütung der abermaligen Füllung einer Flasche (1) mit Bund (3) am Hals (2) enthält ein Mittel (5) für den Abfluß des Inhalts der Flasche (1), dessen Gehäuse am Hals (2) der Flasche (1) angebracht ist, einen Deckel (24), welcher den oberen Teil des Gehäuses des Abflußmittels (5) umgreift und mit diesem mittels einer Schraubverbindung verbunden wird, eine zylindrische Sperrbuchse (29), die den Hals (2) der Flasche (1) und den unteren Teil des Gehäuses des Abflußmittels (5) umschließt, ein ringförmiges Aufreißbund (26), das den Deckel (24) und die Sperrbuchse (29) verbindet. Der untere Teil des zylindrischen Rohrs umgibt den Bund (3) der Flasche (1) und deren Hals (2) im Bereich unter dem Bund (3). Auf der Innenfläche des Rohrs sind im Bereich unter dem Bund (3) längs der Erzeugenden im Längsschnitt keilförmige Vorsprünge (8) ausgebildet, um welche herum Π-förmige Schlitze (16) vorhanden sind, zwischen denen an der Außenseite des Rohrs segmentale Schnittflächen (9) ausgeführt sind, derart, daß dieser Abschnitt des Rohrs im Querschnitt die Form eines Polyeders besitzt, und bei radialer Verformung übersteigt der Umfang der Sperrbuchse (29) im Querschnitt entlang der Mittellinie, der sich im Ergebnis ihrer Verformung bei der Wechselwirkung mit den Vorsprüngen (8) des Rohrs ergibt, im Grunde nicht den Kreisumfang der Sperrbuchse (29) im Querschnitt entlang der Mittellinie vor der genannten Verformung. Auf der Außenfläche des unteren Teils des Deckels (24) ist ein Flansch (27) ausgebildet, auf der Innenfläche des ringförmigen Aufreißbandes (26) sind Klinken (28) vorgesehen, die zum Eingriff mit dem Flansch (27) des Deckels (24) eingerichtet sind. An der Unterkante des ringförmigen Aufreißbandes (26) sind versetzt gegen die Klinken (28) mit ihren einen Enden Stege (34) starr befestigt, deren zweite Enden an der Oberkante der Sperrbuchse (29) versetzt gegen die Befestigungsstelle der ersten Enden starr befestigt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 49/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 49/00 (2006.01); B65D 49/02 (2006.01); B65D 49/04 (2006.01); B65D 55/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 49/04 (2013.01); B65D 55/0872 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238919 A1 20020911; EP 1238919 B1 20040114; AT 257800 T 20040115; DE 50200207 D1 20040219; EA 003596 B1 20030626; EA 200100759 A1 20021031; RU 2175303 C1 20011027; UA 73742 C2 20040315

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040614

2006-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2005-01-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MEDVEDEV, ZINOVY GRIGORIEVICH

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MEDVEDEV, OLEG ZINOVIEVICH

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-04-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040425

2004-04-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-03-17 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: MEDVEDEV, ZINOVY GRIGORIEVICH

2004-03-17 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: MEDVEDEV, OLEG ZINOVIEVICH

2004-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200207 P 20040219

2004-02-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040214

2004-02-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040214

2004-02-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-14 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-14 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2003-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MEDVEDEV, ZINOVY GRIGORIEVICH

2003-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MEDVEDEV, OLEG ZINOVIEVICH

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEDVEDEV, ZINOVY GRIGORIEVICH

2003-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEDVEDEV, OLEG ZINOVIEVICH

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI