Global Patent Index - EP 1238921 A2

EP 1238921 A2 2002-09-11 - Device and method for attaching a straw to a container

Title (en)

Device and method for attaching a straw to a container

Title (de)

Trinkhalmanbringvorrichtung und -verfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour appliquer des chalumeaux d'aspiration sur des récipients

Publication

EP 1238921 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004669 A

Priority

DE 10109875 A

Abstract (en)

The drinking-straws (4) are in the form of a strip (6) which has a layer of adhesive (8) on one side. The drinks-containers (2) are conveyed along a track by a conveyor (10). A feeder (12) in the form of a rotor brings the strip of straws to the track so that the strip's second, non-adhesive side rests against the feeder. A cutter (14) cuts the strip between the straws. At least one pressure appliance (16a,b) presses a straw against a film bag (2b). The cutter has a cavity level with, and as wide as, the adhesive layer.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Trinkhalmanbringvorrichtung zum Anbringen von Trinkhalmen an Getränkebehälter, wobei die Trinkhalme in Form eines Trinkhalmbandes zugeführt werden, das mit einer Klebeschicht versehen ist. Die Zuführeinrichtung weist zumindest jeweils dort, wo eine Schneideinrichtung je zwei Trinkhalme voneinander trennt, jeweils eine Ausnehmung auf, die in ihrer Höhenlage auf die Klebeschicht abgestimmt ist und deren Höhenausdehnung mindestens der Breite der Klebeschicht entspricht. Die Erfindung betrifft weiterhin ein Verfahren zum Anbringen von Trinkhalmen an Getränkebehälter, bei welchem das Trinkhalmband mit einer Schneidvorrichtung im Bereich einer Zuführeinrichtung für die Trinkhalme zwischen je zwei Trinkhalmen zerschnitten wird, wobei die Schneideinrichtung durch die Klebeschicht und das Trinkhalmband in eine Ausnehmung stößt, die der Klebeschicht in ihrer Höhenlage entsprechend an der Zuführeinrichtung vorgesehen ist, wobei die Höhenausdehnung der Ausnehmung mindestens der Breite des Klebebandes entspricht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/28; B65B 61/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 15/00 (2006.01); B65B 61/06 (2006.01); B65B 61/20 (2006.01); B65D 77/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/205 (2013.01); B65D 77/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238921 A2 20020911; EP 1238921 A3 20041201; EP 1238921 B1 20090603; AT 432893 T 20090615; BG 106447 A 20030829; BR 0200623 A 20040525; BR 0200623 B1 20121002; CA 2373461 A1 20020901; CA 2373461 C 20050830; CN 1175989 C 20041117; CN 1374233 A 20021016; CY 1109158 T1 20140702; CZ 20020765 A3 20021016; CZ 299044 B6 20080409; DE 10109875 A1 20020919; DE 10109875 B4 20050421; DE 50213581 D1 20090716; DK 1238921 T3 20090824; ES 2325061 T3 20090825; HK 1048974 A1 20050422; HR P20020183 A2 20030228; HU 0200771 A2 20020928; HU 0200771 A3 20040428; HU 0200771 D0 20020529; HU 228557 B1 20130328; JP 2002347725 A 20021204; JP 3611208 B2 20050119; KR 100455301 B1 20041106; KR 20020070879 A 20020911; PL 203997 B1 20091130; PL 352543 A1 20020909; PT 1238921 E 20090624; RU 2002106200 A 20040320; RU 2230011 C2 20040610; SA 1467 B1 20061029; SI EP1238921 T1 20091031; SK 2862002 A3 20021008; TR 200200552 A2 20021021; TW 548222 B 20030821; UA 75869 C2 20060615; US 2002144488 A1 20021010; US 6990785 B2 20060131; YU 14802 A 20030829; ZA 200201620 B 20020906

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-11-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-10-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2010-11-30 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20100217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100304

2010-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20100224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-09-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-08-25 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2325061 T3

2009-08-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-07-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213581 P 20090716

2009-07-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090401582

2009-06-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2009-06-24 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20090617

2009-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. HORST QUEHL PATENTANWALT

2009-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-06-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2009-06-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080226

2005-11-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DIE ERFINDER HABEN AUF IHRE NENNUNG VERZICHTET

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-08-24 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20041029

- Countries: AL

2005-08-24 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20041029

- Countries: LT

2005-08-24 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20041029

- Countries: LV

2005-08-24 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20041029

- Countries: MK

2005-08-24 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20041029

- Countries: RO

2005-08-24 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20041029

- Countries: SI

2004-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 77/28 A

2004-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 61/20 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI