Global Patent Index - EP 1238923 A2

EP 1238923 A2 2002-09-11 - Sealant container

Title (en)

Sealant container

Title (de)

Dichtmittelbehälter

Title (fr)

Récipient pour matériau d'étanchéité

Publication

EP 1238923 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02003905 A

Priority

DE 20103911 U

Abstract (en)

The container for holding and delivering a free flowing sealing medium has a compressed gas operated piston (18) for compressing the sealing medium held inside the volume (14) of the container. On the end lying opposite the piston the volume has an outlet opening (20) sealed by a first plate (22) which opens by pressure action. The piston has a passage (26) closed off by a second plate (24) which opens following a pressure increase in the piston's pressure chamber and open a path from the compressed gas source through the volume to the outlet opening. The opening of the second plate takes place after the opening of the first.

Abstract (de)

Dichtmittelbehälter zur Aufnahme und Abgabe von fließfähigem Dichtmittel 16 mit einem Druckbehälter 12 und einem in dem Druckbehälter 12 angeordneten und mit Dichtmittel 16 gefüllten Volumen 14, wobei innerhalb des Volumens 14 ein Kolben 18 zur Komprimierung des Dichtmittels 16 angeordnet ist und an dem dem Kolben 18 gegenüberliegenden Ende das Volumen 14 eine mit einer erste Verschlussstelle 22 verschlossene Auslassöffnung 20 aufweist, wobei die erste Verschlussstelle 22 derart ausgebildet ist, dass sie bei Druckbeaufschlagung die Auslassöffnung 20 freigibt. Erfindungsgemäß ist der Kolben 18 mittels einer Druckgasquelle druckbeaufschlagbar, wobei der Kolben 18 eine mit einer zweiten Verschlussstelle 24 verschlossene Durchtrittsöffnung 26 aufweist, wobei die Öffnung der zweiten Verschlussstelle 24 durch eine Druckerhöhung im Druckraum 28 des Kolbens 18 und/oder manuell, mechanisch, elektrisch, pneumatisch oder hydraulisch erfolgt und einen Weg von der Druckgasquelle über das Volumen 14 an die Auslassöffnung 20 freigibt, wobei die Öffnung der zweiten Verschlussstelle 24 nach der Öffnung der ersten Verschlussstelle 22 erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/0005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20103911 U1 20020711; EP 1238923 A2 20020911; EP 1238923 A3 20030402

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031003

2004-02-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 83/00 A

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05C 17/015 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI