Global Patent Index - EP 1238929 A2

EP 1238929 A2 2002-09-11 - Method and device for continuously changing the pile

Title (en)

Method and device for continuously changing the pile

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Non-Stop-Stapelwechsel

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de changement continu de piles

Publication

EP 1238929 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02001560 A

Priority

DE 10111387 A

Abstract (en)

A height-adjustable sheet-separator (14)detaches the top sheet from the stack, conveys it along a conveyor and incorporates at least one sensor (18). A non-stop appliance (2) contains an auxiliary stacking-table (6) of parallel bars (10). The surface of a new main stack of sheets (19) is picked up in the non-stop and sheet-separating appliances. The approach and operating speeds are made compatible. The auxiliary stack table is guided from the stacking area (9) until the end facing away from the non-stop appliance is freely positioned in the stacking area. /the direction of the auxiliary stack is reversed and the non-stop appliance raised until the bars are between the main stack and the residual stack (13).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Non-Stop-Stapelwechsel in einem Bogenanleger mit einer höhenverstellbaren Bogenvereinzelungseinrichtung. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, ein weiteres Verfahren und eine weitere Vorrichtung zu schaffen, die mit einem geringen Aufwand einen störungsfreien Non-Stop-Stapelwechsel auch bei einer nicht exakt waagerecht verlaufenden Oberfläche eines neuen Hauptbogenstapels (19) ermöglichen. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, dass die Oberfläche des neuen Hauptbogenstapels (19) erfasst wird und in Abhängigkeit vom Verlauf der Oberfläche des Hauptbogenstapels (19) unterschiedliche Arbeitsschritte bei der Vereinigung des Restbogenstapels (13) mit dem neuen Hauptbogenstapel (19) realisiert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/30 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238929 A2 20020911; EP 1238929 A3 20040204; EP 1238929 B1 20050406; DE 10111387 A1 20020919; DE 10111387 B4 20040708

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170123

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170929

2017-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170123

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50202678

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 97080 WUERZBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50202678

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150318

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060110

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202678 P 20050512

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040106

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI