Global Patent Index - EP 1238933 A1

EP 1238933 A1 2002-09-11 - Method and device for continuosly winding a material web

Title (en)

Method and device for continuosly winding a material web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Wickelmaschine zum kontinuierlichen Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour continuellement enrouler une bande de matériau

Publication

EP 1238933 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02010520 A

Priority

  • DE 19720495 A
  • DE 19725878 A
  • DE 19735590 A
  • DE 19737709 A
  • DE 19748995 A
  • EP 98928270 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves forming a roll on a drum. The strip (3) is passed over a movable pressure drum (19) which forms a reel gap with the reeling drum (35) mounted in a secondary transport device (5,7). The force in the reel gap is regulated by displacing the pressure drum. When a desired reel (37) diameter is reached the reel is removed from the pressure drum with the secondary transport device so that the strip passes to the reel clear of the pressure drum. A new drum (49) rotating at the speed of the strip is brought into a drum changeover position by a primary transport device to form anew reel gap with the pressure drum. The strip is divided across its breadth and wound onto the new drum using its new end, whereby regulation of the force in the reel gap is again realized by displacing the pressure drum. The secondary transport device takes over the new drum with the new reel and force regulation is maintained.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Wickelmaschine zum kontinuierlichen Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn (3), insbesondere Papier- oder Kartonbahn, auf einen Tambour zu einer Wickelrolle, mit einer Anpreßtrommel (19), über die die Materialbahn (3) geführt ist und die mit der Wickelrolle einen Wickelspalt bildet, mit mindestens einer Primär-Transporteinrichtung (79), mittels derer der Tambour (35;49) entlang einer ersten Führungsbahn verlagerbar ist, und mit mindestens einer Sekundär-Transporteinrichtung (5;7), die den Tambour (35;49) entlang einer zweiten Führungsbahn führt, vorgeschlagen. Die Wickelmaschine zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß zur Vorbereitung eines Tambourwechsels der neue Tambour (35;49) mittels der Primär-Transporteinrichtung (79) in eine Tambourwechselposition verlagerbar ist, in der ein neuer Wickelspalt zwischen dem neuen Tambour (35;49) und der Anpreßtrommel (19) gebildet wird, und daß während der Tambour (35;49) von der Sekundär-Transporteinrichtung (5;7) geführt wird, der Durchmesserzuwachs der Wickelrolle durch eine Verlagerung der Sekundär-Transporteinrichtung (5;7) ausgleichbar und die Linienkraft im Wickelspalt durch eine Verlagerung der Anpreßtrommel (19) einstellbar, vorzugsweise regelbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/26; B65H 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/26 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01); B65H 19/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2261 (2013.01); B65H 18/26 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41468 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01); B65H 2408/2364 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238933 A1 20020911; EP 1238933 B1 20060322

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59813447

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130515

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130515

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 320996 T

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110513

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2006-07-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813447 P 20060511

2006-03-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0912435 P

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040202

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MOELLER, ROLAND

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PREISING, RALF

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BEISSWANGER, RUDOLF

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MADRZAK, ZYGMUNT

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KAIPF, WALTER

2002-09-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 912435

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE