Global Patent Index - EP 1238934 A1

EP 1238934 A1 2002-09-11 - Flexible jogger for a signature feeding station

Title (en)

Flexible jogger for a signature feeding station

Title (de)

Flexibler Rüttler für eine Signaturenzuführstation

Title (fr)

Vibreur flexible pour une station d'alimentation

Publication

EP 1238934 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02003161 A

Priority

US 79737401 A

Abstract (en)

A back stop (24) and a flexible jogging element (26) are individually disposed at the opposing sides of a hopper (16). The jogging element is oscillated in a direction lateral to the vertical direction to periodically bend the jogging element against the stack (8) of signatures (4) and form a pushing zone (40) and a vibrating zone (42) in the hopper. The jogging element urges the signatures in the pushing zone against the back stop to register the signatures as the stack is formed, and vibrates the signatures in the vibrating zone to improve the registration of the signatures in the stack. An Independent claim is also included for a method for jogging signatures in a signature feeder.

Abstract (de)

Eine Signaturenzuführstation (9) umfasst einen rückwärtigen Anschlag (24), der an einer ersten Seite eines Magazins (16) der Zuführstation (10) angeordnet ist, und ein flexibles Rüttelelement (25), das an der der ersten Seite gegenüberliegenden zweiten Seite angeordnet ist. Während der Bildung eines Signaturenstapels (8) im Magazin (16) wird das flexible Rüttelelement (25) seitlich hin und her bewegt, so dass es sich periodisch gegen den Signaturenstapel (8) biegt und im Magazin (16) ein Schubbereich (40) und ein Vibrationsbereich (42) entstehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/38; B65H 31/34; B65H 31/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/38 (2013.01); B65H 2404/56 (2013.01); B65H 2405/112 (2013.01); B65H 2405/113 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238934 A1 20020911; EP 1238934 B1 20041201; DE 10206291 A1 20020926; DE 50201645 D1 20050105; US 2002121736 A1 20020905; US 6572101 B2 20030603

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50201645

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110309

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050320

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201645 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOSS INTERNATIONAL AMERICAS, INC.

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI