Global Patent Index - EP 1238935 A2

EP 1238935 A2 2002-09-11 - Lower blade shaft for a rotary slitting machine

Title (en)

Lower blade shaft for a rotary slitting machine

Title (de)

Untermesserwelle für eine Rollschneidmaschine

Title (fr)

Porte-couteau inférieur pour une machine de découpage rotative

Publication

EP 1238935 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004593 A

Priority

DE 10111112 A

Abstract (en)

The lower cutter shaft has at least a number of lower cutters (3) on it, in fact an above-average number of them. The lower cutters are set out at a regular spacings. The spacings between these cutters provide a wide selection of strip width from which to select the one most appropriate for the strip required to be cut.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Untermesserwelle für eine Rollenschneidmaschine zum Längsschneiden von Folien und Bändern in Streifen mit mindestens einem Untermesser (3). Eine flexible Anpassung einer derartigen Untermesserwelle an verschiedene Schnittbreiten wird erfindungsgemäß dadurch gewährleistet, daß die Untermesserwelle eine über die Schnittanzahl hinausgehende Anzahl von Untermessern (3) aufweist, die Untermesser (3) in im wesentlichen regelmäßigen Abständen auf der Untermesserwelle angeordnet sind und die Abstände zwischen den Untermessern (3) eine flexible Wahl der Breite der Streifen zulassend gewählt sind. Für die Veröffentlichung mit der Zusammenfassung ist die Fig. 1 vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/00 (2006.01); B26D 7/20 (2006.01); B65H 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/02 (2013.01); B26D 1/0006 (2013.01); B26D 7/20 (2013.01); B26D 2001/0046 (2013.01); B26D 2001/0066 (2013.01); B26D 2007/202 (2013.01); B65H 2404/13161 (2013.01); Y10T 83/783 (2015.04); Y10T 83/7876 (2015.04)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • CH 288737 A 19530215 - JAGENBERG WERKE AG [DE]
  • WINGEN P: "Moderne Schneid-Systeme", HOECHSTE QUALITAET UND PRAEZISION DURCH DIENES-SYSTEM DUO RING, KOELN, pages 1 - 11, XP002906014
  • "Serienkatalog BILSTEIN (Auszug: Titelblatt, Inhaltsvertzeichnis, Seite 1-1. 5-1.1 bis 5-5, 8-3, R}ckseite)", ANNOUNCEMENT BILSTEIN, XX, XX, 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XX, pages 1 - 10, XP002959764

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238935 A2 20020911; EP 1238935 A3 20031015; EP 1238935 B1 20060503; AT 325071 T 20060615; DE 10111112 A1 20021002; DE 10111112 B4 20051222; DE 50206614 D1 20060608; DK 1238935 T3 20060828; ES 2262718 T3 20061201; NO 20021137 A 20020909; NO 20021137 D0 20020307; NO 327081 B1 20090420; US 2002184986 A1 20021212

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110323

2011-04-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110405

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-04 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-09-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090323

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090313

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Free text: HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH#ETTORE-BUGATTI-STRASSE 6-14#51149 KOELN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH#ETTORE-BUGATTI-STRASSE 6-14#51149 KOELN (DE)

2007-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2007-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-12-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2262718 T3

2006-10-06 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060402661

2006-10-03 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-08-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-08-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2006-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-06-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206614 P 20060608

2006-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-05-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-02-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI