Global Patent Index - EP 1238937 A1

EP 1238937 A1 2002-09-11 - Method and device for clearing yarn by cutting out defects

Title (en)

Method and device for clearing yarn by cutting out defects

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Garnreinigung durch Herausschneiden von Fehlstellen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour l'épuration de fil textile par découpage des défauts

Publication

EP 1238937 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01104536 A

Priority

EP 01104536 A

Abstract (en)

In a process to remove spinning faults from textile yarn (1) the faults are detected by a sensor and cut out, the good ends being spliced. When a sequence of faults occurs, the initial sequence of faulty material is not immediately cut out, but accumulated and then cut out in a single length. Also claimed is commensurate a yarn-cleaning assembly with a sensor head (8), a cutting and splice unit (7) with a control unit (6). The process has several yarn-cleaning stations. At a first cleaning station the faulty yarn section is removed at once. At a second cleaning station the faulty yarn is not immediately removed. If a cluster of faults is detected, operation of the two stations is synchronised to form a single operation. The system activates the cutting operation using the number of faults detected per unit length of yarn.

Abstract (de)

Bei der Reinigung eines Garns (1) werden Fehlstellen detektiert und herausgeschnitten. Bei einer Häufung von Fehlstellen wird ein unmittelbares Herausschneiden unterdrückt, um sodann mehrere Fehlstellen gleichzeitig herauszuschneiden. Dadurch wird einerseits die Zahl der Spleissstellen reduziert, andererseits die Verarbeitungsgeschwindigkeit erhöht, da mehrere Fehlstellen gleichzeitig in einem einzigen Reinigungsschritt herausgeschnitten werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 63/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/06 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] EP 0628509 A1 19941214 - MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238937 A1 20020911; EP 1238937 B1 20040818; CZ 20020752 A3 20021016; CZ 301260 B6 20091223; DE 50103313 D1 20040923; JP 2002308529 A 20021023; JP 4194784 B2 20081210

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180312

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170403

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-06 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20110227

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GEBRUEDER LOEPFE AG

- Free text: GEBRUEDER LOEPFE AG#KASTELLSTRASSE 10#CH-8623 WETZIKON (CH) -TRANSFER TO- GEBRUEDER LOEPFE AG#KASTELLSTRASSE 10#CH-8623 WETZIKON (CH)

2005-07-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Effective date: 20050513

2005-07-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Effective date: 20050513

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103313 P 20040923

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI