Global Patent Index - EP 1238940 A2

EP 1238940 A2 2002-09-11 - Operating lever for industrial truck

Title (en)

Operating lever for industrial truck

Title (de)

Bedienhebel für Flurförderzeug

Title (fr)

Levier de commande pour chariot de manutention

Publication

EP 1238940 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004874 A

Priority

DE 10110463 A

Abstract (en)

The operating lever is fitted to the driver's seat by one lever arm (2). This lever arm is fitted to the driver's seat by a lockable pivot. The operating lever is attached to the lever arm by a lockable pivot. The locks of both these pivots can be released and locked simultaneously using only one hand, independently of the release lever (4).

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist eine Bedienanordnung für eine mobile Arbeitsmaschine, insbesondere für ein Flurförderzeug, bei der ein Bedienhebel (3) mittels eines Hebelarms (2) an einem Fahrersitz angeordnet ist. Dabei ist der Hebelarm (2) mittels eines arretierbaren Gelenks am Fahrersitz befestigt ist und der Bedienhebel (3) mittels eines arretierbaren Gelenks am Hebelarm (2) befestigt. Erfindungsgemäß sind die Arretierungen beider Gelenke gleichzeitig mit derselben Hand lösbar und verriegelbar. Die baugleich ausgeführten Arretierungen des Bedienhebels (3) und des Hebelarms (2) sind jeweils mittels eines Auslösehebels (4) auch unabhängig voneinander lösbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/20 (2006.01); G05G 9/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/20 (2013.01); G05G 9/047 (2013.01); G05G 2009/04774 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1238940 A2 20020911; EP 1238940 A3 20051102; DE 10110463 A1 20020912

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070725

2007-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060710

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060710

2006-07-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060411

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 66F 9/20 A

2005-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 25J 13/02 B

2005-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 02F 9/20 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI