Global Patent Index - EP 1239025 A2

EP 1239025 A2 2002-09-11 - Detergent composition and laundry treatment compositon comprising dye transfer inhibiting and dye fixing agent

Title (en)

Detergent composition and laundry treatment compositon comprising dye transfer inhibiting and dye fixing agent

Title (de)

Waschmittel und Wäschebehandlungsmittel enthaltend farbübertragungsinhibierend Farbfixiermittel

Title (fr)

Composition détergente et composition de traitement du linge comprenant un agent inhibant le transfert des couleurs et fixant les couleurs

Publication

EP 1239025 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004065 A

Priority

  • DE 10110337 A
  • DE 10150723 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2002363595A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a novel detergent having an improved color migration- preventive effect. SOLUTION: The laundry detergent contains a color migration-preventive dye fixative obtained by (a) allowing an amine to react with epichlorohydrin or (b) allowing a cyanamide and an amine to react with formaldehyde.

Abstract (de)

In Waschmitteln, die nichtionische Tenside enthalten, werden folgende farbübertragungsinhibierenden Farbfixiermittel eingesetzt: Umsetzungsprodukte aus a) Aminen mit Epichlorhydrin oder, b) Cyanamid mit Aminen und Aldehyden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 1/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/24 (2006.01); C11D 3/30 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); D06L 3/00 (2006.01); D06M 16/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0021 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239025 A2 20020911; EP 1239025 A3 20030903; JP 2002363595 A 20021218; US 2002193280 A1 20021219; US 7091167 B2 20060815

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100401

2007-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060816

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

2004-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI