Global Patent Index - EP 1239028 A1

EP 1239028 A1 2002-09-11 - Detergent tablets

Title (en)

Detergent tablets

Title (de)

Waschmitteltabletten

Title (fr)

Tablettes détergentes

Publication

EP 1239028 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01301981 A

Priority

EP 01301981 A

Abstract (en)

A process for producing a multiphase detergent tablet comprising the steps of: a) introducing a first composition into a mould and compacting; b) introducing a second composition as a separate layer into the mould and compacting ; c) introducing a further composition as a layer into a mould and compacting with the same or greater force than for step a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 7/16 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/16 (2013.01); C11D 3/3707 (2013.01); C11D 17/0078 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239028 A1 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040310

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021016

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI