Global Patent Index - EP 1239039 A1

EP 1239039 A1 2002-09-11 - NOVEL POLYPEPTIDE AND DNA THEREOF

Title (en)

NOVEL POLYPEPTIDE AND DNA THEREOF

Title (de)

NEUES POLYPEPTID UND DAFÜR KODIERENDE DNA

Title (fr)

NOUVEAU POLYPEPTIDE ET SON ADN

Publication

EP 1239039 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00981749 A

Priority

  • JP 0008896 W
  • JP 35870799 A
  • JP 2000046825 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides novel polypeptides having physiological activity related to anterior pituitary hormones (such as LH, FSH, and TSH), DNAs coding for such polypeptides, methods for screening compounds or their salts which promote or inhibit the activity of the polypeptides of the present invention, and the like. The polypeptides of the present invention have physiological activity related to anterior pituitary hormones (such as LH, FSH, and TSH), and can thus be used as a drug for the treatment of hypertension, autoimmune diseases, cardiac failure, and the like. The polypeptides of the present invention are also useful as a reagent for screening compounds or their salts which promote or inhibit the activity of the polypeptides of the present invention; and said compounds obtained by such screening are promising as a drug for the prevention and treatment of hypertension, autoimmune diseases, cardiac failure, and the like. Antibodies against the polypeptides of the present invention are also capable of specifically recognizing the polypeptides of the present invention, and can thus be used for quantification and the like of the polypeptides of the present invention in samples.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/16; A61K 45/00; A61P 9/04; A61P 9/12; A61P 37/04; C07K 14/59; C12N 1/15; C12N 1/19; C12N 1/21; C12N 5/00; C12P 21/02; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/15; G01N 33/50; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61P 9/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/59 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 15/16 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/59 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239039 A1 20020911; EP 1239039 A4 20040506; AU 1891301 A 20010625; CA 2394420 A1 20010621; US 2003143695 A1 20030731; WO 0144475 A1 20010621

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070216

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED

2004-05-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040319

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020614

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI