Global Patent Index - EP 1239061 A2

EP 1239061 A2 2002-09-11 - Electroplating Installation

Title (en)

Electroplating Installation

Title (de)

Galvanikanlage

Title (fr)

Installation de galvanisation

Publication

EP 1239061 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005140 A

Priority

DE 20104072 U

Abstract (en)

A galvanizing plant has a number of galvanizing baths arranged in rows or groups. Each row or group is provided with a storage-programmable control unit (1) by which each bath of the row or group can be controlled. The control units are connected underneath each other using a first network (3) and connected to a server computer (6). Servicing and observation computers (8, 9, 10) are connected to the server computer using a second network (4). Preferred Features: The server computer has a stationary USV unit.

Abstract (de)

Eine Galvanikanlage hat eine Vielzahl von Galvanikbädern, die in mehreren Badreihen bzw. -gruppen angeordnet sind. Ohne beim Betrieb dieser Galvanikanlage die beispielsweise bei Wartungsarbeiten, z.B. bei Flugzeugwartungen, vorgegebenen Zeitraster besser und mit einem geringeren Aufwand einhalten zu können wird vorgeschlagen, dass je Badreihe bzw. -gruppe der Galvanikanlage eine speicherprogrammierbare Steuereinheit SPS (1) vorgesehen ist, mittels der jeweils die Galvanikbäder einer Badreihe bzw. -gruppe steuerbar sind, dass die speicherprogrammierbaren Steuereinheiten SPS (1) mittels eines ersten Netzwerks (3) untereinander und mit einer Server-PC-Einrichtung (6) verbunden sind, und dass Bedien- und Beobachtungs-PC (8, 9, 10) mittels eines zweiten Netzwerks (4) an die Server-PC-Einrichrichtung (6) angeschlossen sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05B 19/05; C25D 19/00; C25D 21/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 21/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 21/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20104072 U1 20010607; EP 1239061 A2 20020911; EP 1239061 A3 20040303

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091001

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041125

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041125

2004-11-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 05B 19/05 A

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 25D 21/12 B

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 25D 19/00 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI