Global Patent Index - EP 1239063 A1

EP 1239063 A1 2002-09-11 - Method for producing meltblown non-wovens, non-wovens produced thereby and use of such non-wovens

Title (en)

Method for producing meltblown non-wovens, non-wovens produced thereby and use of such non-wovens

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von schmelzgeblasenen Vliesstoffen, daraus hergestellte schmelzgeblasene Vliesstoffe und Verwendung der schmelzgeblasenen Vliesstoffe

Title (fr)

Procédé de production de non-tissés obtenus par fusion-soufflage, non-tissés obtenus par ledit procédé et utilisation de tels non-tissés

Publication

EP 1239063 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01102127 A

Priority

EP 01102127 A

Abstract (en)

Melt leaving the nozzle outlets (3.1) is blown by air streams (V1,V2) from air channels (L1,L2) on both sides to form fibers. The fiber flow (9) leaves the nozzle at an outlet angle ( alpha ) of 5-70 degrees , whose shanks (51,61) are formed by the long axis (5) through the polymer channel (2) in the nozzle and the central axis (6) of the diverted fiber flow.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines schmelzgeblasenen Faservlieses aus thermoplastischem Kunststoff, wobei der Faserstrom (9) die Düsenöffnung (3) in einem Austrittswinkel α von 5° bis 70°, welcher durch die, durch die Düsenachse verlaufende Längsachse (5) des Polymerkanals (2) als seinen ersten Schenkel (51) und durch die Mittelachse (6) des Faserstromes (9) als seinen zweiten Schenkel (61) gebildet wird, verläßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 4/02; D01D 5/098; D04H 1/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 4/02 (2006.01); D01D 5/098 (2006.01); D04H 1/56 (2006.01); D04H 1/70 (2006.01); D04H 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 3/16 (2013.01); D01D 4/025 (2013.01); D01D 5/0985 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239063 A1 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040226

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANDLER AG

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI