Global Patent Index - EP 1239067 A1

EP 1239067 A1 2002-09-11 - Device for producing leno fabrics

Title (en)

Device for producing leno fabrics

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Drehergeweben

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication de tissus de gaze

Publication

EP 1239067 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02405077 A

Priority

  • EP 02405077 A
  • EP 01810224 A

Abstract (en)

A leno fabric manufacturing apparatus comprises a needle bar (3) for ground threads; insertion element(s) (4) for leno threads; and a mechanism for the insertion of weft threads. A pivotal arrangement (6, 7) is connected directly to a main drive (51) of the weaving machine, by which the insertion element and the needle bar can be moved.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Drehergeweben (1) in einer Webmaschine umfasst eine Nadelbarre (3) für Steherfäden (13), mindestens ein Einlegeelement (4) für Dreherfäden (4) und Mittel zum Eintragen von Schussfäden (12). Eine Schwenkanordnung (5, 6, 7) ist direkt an einen Hauptantrieb (51) der Webmaschine angeschlossen. Mit dieser Schwenkanordnung lassen sich das Einlegeelement sowie die Nadelbarre bewegen, so dass sich der für die Steher- und Dreherfäden notwendige Bewegungsablauf ergibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 7/06; D03C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 7/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239067 A1 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091020

2009-11-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ITEMA (SWITZERLAND) LTD.

2008-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080821

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULTEX AG

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI