Global Patent Index - EP 1239074 A1

EP 1239074 A1 2002-09-11 - Process for producing satinated paper

Title (en)

Process for producing satinated paper

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erzeugung von satiniertem Papier

Title (fr)

Procede pour la preparation de papier satine

Publication

EP 1239074 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01105754 A

Priority

EP 01105754 A

Abstract (en)

To produce a super-calendered paper, the pulp (S) is prepared (1) for a papermaking machine (2) to deliver a dry web for a polishing press (3) which polishes the web surfaces between surfaces which are pressed together. At the pulp preparation stage, the fiber suspension is processed at a grinder (5) to give the pulp a consistency of 2-8% and preferably 3-5%. The grinding intensity is set to give the required pulp character for subsequent web polishing, and is increased if the surface polishing is insufficient. To produce a polished super-calendered paper web, the pulp grinding intensity is adjusted by its specific grindability or the every second grinding edge lengths without altering the proportional specific grindability so that it remains constant. The grinding action takes place in a refiner, and the every second grinding edge length variation is set by altering the rotary speed. The blade clothing in the refiner is at a cutting angle of maximum 15 degrees . During grinding, the every second edge loading is at least 1000 Ws/km or at least 2000 Ws/km. During grinding, a pure specific grindability of at least 100 kWh/t is transferred. The grinding action gives a ground degree of at least 70 degrees SR. The fiber suspension is composed of at least 80% used paper materials of used newspapers, magazines and waste office paper. The pulp preparation station has at least one ink separation and removal function. At the web polishing stage, a flat surface pressure is applied to the web of maximum 100 N/mm<2>, using a super calender. The process control uses the achieved web polish as a reference for adjustments to the pulp grinder. The surface pressures during the surface polishing are held so low, that a permissible black satinizing value is not breached, and the pulp grinding intensity is set high enough to give the required polish level. The low pressure level at the surface polishing stage ensures that the polished web has the required level of whiteness, and the pulp grinding intensity is increased until the desired web surface polish is achieved.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren dient der Erzeugung von hochwertigem satinierten Papier und enthält die drei Verfahrensabschnitte Stoffaufbereitung (1), Papierbildung (2) und Satinageprozess (3). Erfindungsgemäß werden die bei der Durchführung des Verfahrens verwendeten Papierfasern einer speziellen Mahlung (5) unterzogen, bei der die Intensität der Mahlung auf die Neigung zur Schwarzsatinage im Satinageprozess (3) abgestimmt wird Diese Abstimmung kann mit Hilfe eines Prozessrechners vorgenommen werden. In Kombination mit dem Satinageprozess (3) wird dann ein Papier mit besonders guter Bedruckbarkeit erzeugt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21B 1/06; D21G 1/00; D21H 23/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21B 1/06 (2006.01); D21D 1/30 (2006.01); D21G 1/00 (2006.01); D21H 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21D 1/30 (2013.01); D21B 1/06 (2013.01); D21D 1/306 (2013.01); D21G 1/00 (2013.01); D21H 11/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239074 A1 20020911; EP 1239074 B1 20050831; AT 303467 T 20050915; DE 50107277 D1 20051006

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120308

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50107277

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 303467 T

- Effective date: 20120308

2012-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120308

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120309

2012-10-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110314

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110314

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110404

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110314

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50107277 P 20051006

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040806

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI