Global Patent Index - EP 1239076 A2

EP 1239076 A2 2002-09-11 - Sealing device

Title (en)

Sealing device

Title (de)

Dichtungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d' étanchéité

Publication

EP 1239076 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01130485 A

Priority

DE 10110946 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002175477A1] Sealing device for sealing at least one zone of underpressure or overpressure adjoining a moving surface that includes at least one sealing element, positionable opposite the moving surface to form a front and a rear, with respect to a surface running direction, with a sealing section located at the front and a ventilation section located at the rear. The sealing section is structured to sealingly interact with the moving surface and the ventilation section is structured to contact the moving surface and includes a run off surface having at least one of a substantially sawtooth and wavy shape surface arranged at an end of the rear.

Abstract (de)

Eine Dichtungseinrichtung zur Abdichtung wenigstens einer an eine bewegte Fläche (12) angrenzenden Unterdruck- oder Überdruckzone in einer Papiermaschine umfaßt wenigstens ein der bewegten Fläche (12) gegenüberliegendes Dichtelement (10), das einen dichtend mit der bewegten Fläche (12) zusammenwirkenden, in Laufrichtung der bewegten Fläche (12) betrachtet vorderen Dichtabschnitt (16) und einen sich daran anschließenden, in Laufrichtung (L) betrachtet hinteren Belüftungsabschnitt (18) aufweist. Der Belüftungsabschnitt (18) ist auf seiner der bewegten Fläche (12) zugewandten Oberfläche mit einer Vielzahl von sich jeweils in Laufrichtung (L) erstreckenden nebeneinander angeordneten Zähnen (20) versehen, die so gestaltet und angeordnet sind, daß die dazwischen gebildeten, zum in Laufrichtung betrachtet hinteren Ende hin offenen Nuten (22) jeweils einen sich in Laufrichtung kontinuierlich erweiternden Querschnitt besitzen und sich am hinteren Ende des Belüftungsabschnitts (18) eine zumindest im wesentlichen sägezahn- oder wellenförmige Ablaufkante (24) ergibt. Überdies wird eine Dichtungseinrichtung mit einem schwenkbar gelagerten Dichtelement (10) vorgeschlagen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239076 A2 20020911; EP 1239076 A3 20030827; EP 1239076 B1 20090819; AT 440173 T 20090915; DE 10110946 A1 20020912; DE 50115054 D1 20091001; US 2002175477 A1 20021128; US 2004195779 A1 20041007; US 7090219 B2 20060815

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151220

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151220

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 440173 T

- Effective date: 20151220

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50115054

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131221

2014-07-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100520

2009-10-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-10-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50115054 P 20091001

2009-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-05-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011220

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI