Global Patent Index - EP 1239077 A1

EP 1239077 A1 2002-09-11 - Paper based material with improved printability

Title (en)

Paper based material with improved printability

Title (de)

Rohpapier mit verbesserter Bedruckbarkeit

Title (fr)

Materiau à base de papier facilement imprimable

Publication

EP 1239077 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02005417 A

Priority

DE 10111115 A

Abstract (en)

A paper (I) has a surface comprising a non-ionic surfactant (II) having a polyalkoxylene structure. <??>Independent claims are also included for : <??>(i) a decorating impregnate or decorative coating material containing the paper (I); and <??>(ii) a process for the production of the paper (I) by application of a non-ionic surfactant (II) onto the surface of a non-sized paper.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Rohpapier mit verbesserter Bedruckbarkeit, insbesondere ein solches Dekorrohpapier, dessen Oberfläche ein eine Polyalkoxylenstruktur enthaltendes nichtionisches Tensid aufweist sowie daraus erhaltene Dekorimprägnate oder dekorative Beschichtungswerkstoffe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 17/53; D21H 19/10; D21H 27/00; D21H 25/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/22 (2006.01); D21H 17/53 (2006.01); D21H 19/14 (2006.01); D21H 25/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/22 (2013.01); D21H 17/53 (2013.01); D21H 19/14 (2013.01); D21H 25/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XD] DE 19616733 A1 19971106 - STOCKHAUSEN CHEM FAB GMBH [DE], et al
  • [X] US 5246756 A 19930921 - ALL FRANK E [US], et al
  • [X] US 5503669 A 19960402 - KLIMA RUDOLPH F [US], et al
  • [X] US 5045587 A 19910903 - TANAKA KATSUTOSHI [JP]
  • [AD] EP 0478177 A1 19920401 - MEAD CORP [US]
  • [A] WO 0110939 A1 20010215 - BASF AG [DE], et al
  • [XD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 197 (C - 0833) 21 May 1991 (1991-05-21)
  • [XD] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198126, Derwent World Patents Index; Class E19, AN 1981-46905D, XP002201207
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 197713, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A97, AN 1977-22558Y, XP002201208
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198720, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A89, AN 1987-140074, XP002201209
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198850, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A21, AN 1988-358587, XP002201210

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239077 A1 20020911; DE 10111115 A1 20021002

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-21 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060513

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040421

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-06-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI