Global Patent Index - EP 1239078 A1

EP 1239078 A1 2002-09-11 - Curtain coater

Title (en)

Curtain coater

Title (de)

Vorhangsbeschichter

Title (fr)

Enduiseuse à rideau

Publication

EP 1239078 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02003073 A

Priority

DE 10110633 A

Abstract (en)

The coating process for a dry web of paper/cardboard to apply a coating of a liquid or paste medium, and especially a watery pigment suspension, uses a curtain applicator (2). The coating curtain (3) drops on to the outer surface (1b) of the moving web, to be drawn into the web by suction and be anchored within the web structure. The underpressure unit is located at the under surface (1a) of the web, at least at the point (P) where the coating curtain strikes the web surface. The web curtain coating applicator has a suction box to generate the underpressure, with a seal at the incoming and/or outgoing side e.g. as a scraper or brush, set against the web. The underpressure unit has a suction zone (5a) at the web support roller (4).

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zum ein- oder beidseitigen Auftragen von flüssigem oder pastösem Auftragsmedium, insbesondere wässrige Pigmentsuspension, auf eine laufende Materialbahn, insbesondere auf eine Papier- oder Kartonbahn bei deren Herstellung und /oder Veredelung umfassend ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, dass die Unterdruck-Erzeugungseinrichtung der vom Auftragsmedium-Vorhang abgewandten Seite der Materialbahn zumindest dem Bereich der Position P zugeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/48; B05C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/00 (2006.01); D21H 23/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/48 (2013.01); Y10S 118/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239078 A1 20020911; DE 10110633 A1 20020919; JP 2002336757 A 20021126; US 2002124796 A1 20020912; US 6599364 B2 20030729

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041129

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI