Global Patent Index - EP 1239079 A1

EP 1239079 A1 2002-09-11 - Paper sheet with small cushions

Title (en)

Paper sheet with small cushions

Title (de)

Papierbahn mit kleinen Kissen

Title (fr)

Feuille de papier avec coussinets

Publication

EP 1239079 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01400629 A

Priority

EP 01400629 A

Abstract (en)

The paper consists of at least two layers of crepe cellulose wadding weighing 10 - 40 g/sq m, the upper layer being between 0.6 and 2 per cent longer than the lower one and embossed to form protuberances (12) in rows (14) that are joined to the lower layer to make cushions (16) of 1 - 20 sq cm in area. The cushions have a length to width ratio of preferably 1 - 1.5 : 1, and the protuberances are truncated conical in shape with bases of 1 - 1.5 mm diameter and preferably not more than 1.5 mm apart. The two-layer paper is made from two separate rolls of paper, with the upper layer taken round an embossing roller and past an adhesive application roller before the two layers are joined together and made into rolls of smaller diameter.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention porte sur une feuille de papier constituée d'au moins deux plis d'ouate de cellulose crêpée, un pli supérieur et un pli inférieur, chacun de grammage compris entre 10 et 40 g/m<2>, dont le pli supérieur est gaufré et pourvu de premières protubérances. Elle est caractérisée en ce que les dites premières protubérances sont réparties selon des alignements qui délimitent entre eux des cellules de surface comprise entre 1 et 20 cm<2>, le pli supérieur étant plus long sens marche que le pli inférieur d'au moins 0,6 % et lié à lui par le sommet des premières protubérances de telle façon qu'il se forme des coussinets à l'intérieur des cellules. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 27/40; B31F 1/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2006.01); D21H 27/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2013.01); D21H 27/40 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0733 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0738 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0756 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0761 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0784 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0787 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0789 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24463 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24612 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239079 A1 20020911; EP 1239079 B1 20070613; AT 364751 T 20070715; CA 2406480 A1 20020919; CA 2406480 C 20100112; DE 60128890 D1 20070726; DE 60128890 T2 20080207; DK 1239079 T3 20071008; ES 2287087 T3 20071216; NO 20025389 A 20030109; NO 20025389 D0 20021111; NO 333379 B1 20130521; PT 1239079 E 20070914; RU 2295600 C2 20070320; US 2004023003 A1 20040205; US 7846531 B2 20101207; WO 02072956 A1 20020919

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160310

2017-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-04-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170428

2017-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161006

2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2017-02-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20070402621

- Effective date: 20161006

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2017-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2016-12-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160310

2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160909

2016-11-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2016-11-16 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 364751 T

- Effective date: 20160309

2016-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2016-10-24 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150309

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150304

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-20 [REG DE R100] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60128890

- Effective date: 20120412

2012-08-01 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20120412

2012-06-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

- Effective date: 20080313

2010-09-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080309

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

2008-04-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

- Effective date: 20080313

2007-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2287087 T3

2007-10-08 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2007-10-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070402621

2007-09-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-09-14 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20070904

2007-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070726

2007-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60128890 P 20070726

2007-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2007-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-06-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI