Global Patent Index - EP 1239082 A2

EP 1239082 A2 2002-09-11 - Extendable screed for a road paver

Title (en)

Extendable screed for a road paver

Title (de)

Ausziehbohle für einen Strassenfertiger

Title (fr)

Poutre lisseuse extensible pour un finisseur

Publication

EP 1239082 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005534 A

Priority

DE 20104129 U

Abstract (en)

The telescopic board (B) has a base body (G) and two telescopic bodies (A) at its rear side. The telescopic bodies are individually height-adjustable, slide out from the middle and are prevented from rotating by a torque-uptake device. An abutment (W) at the base body is arranged behind and below the torque-uptake device near the rear lower edge of the base body. A gripper arrangement (E) at the lower front edge of the telescopic body permanently engages the abutment. A height-adjustment device (H) is arranged between the gripper arrangement and a sliding guide.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Ausziehbohle (B) für einen Straßenfertiger, mit einem Bohlengrundkörper (G), an dem zwei relativ zum Bohlengrundkörper höheneinstellbare Ausziehbohlenkörper (A) ausschiebbar und gegen Verdrehen durch eine Drehmoment-Aufnahmevorrichtung (M) abgestützt sind, ist am Bohlengrundkörper (G) ein Widerlager (W) der Drehmomentaufnahmevorrichtung (M) hinten unten nahe der hinteren Unterkante (K) des Bohlengrundkörpers angeordnet, ist am Ausziehbohlenkörper (A) unten eine Greifanordnung (E) in Eingriff mit dem Widerlager (W) vorgesehen, und befindet sich die Höhenverstellvorrichtung (H) des Ausziehbohlenkörpers (A) zwischen der Greifanordnung (E) und der Ausschiebeführung (S). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/40 (2013.01); E01C 2301/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20104129 U1 20010517; EP 1239082 A2 20020911; EP 1239082 A3 20030813; EP 1239082 B1 20050601

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180328

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-19 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Free text: CORRECTIONS ALLOWED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 28 NOVEMBER 2011 ALLOWED ON 28 APRIL 2012

2012-04-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JOSEPH VOEGELE AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: JOSEPH VOEGELE AG, 68163 MANNHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 50203231

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-04-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50203231

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-04-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50203231

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-03-28 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Free text: REQUEST FILED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 28 NOVEMBER 2011

2012-02-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50203231

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

2011-12-30 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-06-24 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2006-05-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50203231 P 20050707

2005-06-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-06-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GRUNDL ROLAND

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERNHARDT, CARSTEN

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI