Global Patent Index - EP 1239083 A2

EP 1239083 A2 2002-09-11 - Building structure with walls having substantially externally placed tensioning members

Title (en)

Building structure with walls having substantially externally placed tensioning members

Title (de)

Bauwerk mit Wandungen mit im wesentlichen verbundfrei angeordneten Spanngliedern

Title (fr)

Construction avec des parois comportant des éléments de tension sensiblement sans adhérence

Publication

EP 1239083 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450039 A

Priority

AT 3492001 A

Abstract (en)

A structure consists of walls with external tensioning members (6) surrounded by a corrosion protection material and a mantle made of plastic. The tensioning member cross section is round, and the members are fixed in the walls. The deflecting members (4) have numerous cut-outs (10), and the surrounding mantle of the tensioning members is surrounded by the surfaces. <??>A structure consists of walls with external tensioning members (6) surrounded by a corrosion protection material and a mantle made of plastic. The tensioning member cross section is round, and the members are fixed in the walls. The deflecting members (4) have numerous cut-outs (10), and the surrounding mantle of the tensioning members is surrounded by the surfaces. The tensioning members are held apart by raised sections (11). The deflecting members consist of plastic, especially polyethylene, with a Shore D hardness of 60-65.

Abstract (de)

Bauwerk mit Wandungen mit im wesentlichen verbundfrei, insbesondere außerhalb der Wandungen, angeordneten, z. B. mit Litzen aufgebauten, Spanngliedern (6), die insbesondere von einer Korrosionsschutzmasse umgeben sind, und mit einem die Spannglieder (6) und gegebenenfalls die Korrosionsschutzmasse umhüllenden im Querschnitt in sich materialbündig geschlossenen Mantel aus Kunststoff od. dgl., aufgebaut sind, welcher insbesondere im Querschnitt im wesentlichen rund, vorzugsweise kreisförmig, ist, wobei zumindest deren Enden, insbesondere in den Wandungen, festgelegt sind, und die Spannglieder (6) zwischen ihren Enden in ihrer Spannrichtung entlang einer in dieser Richtung stetig verlaufenden Fläche eines Umlenkteiles (4) umgelenkt sind, wobei der Umlenkteil (4) eine Vielzahl von in Abstand zueinander angeordnete Ausnehmungen (10) mit den stetig verlaufenden Flächen aufweist, und der umhüllende Mantel der Spannglieder zumindest teilweise, insbesondere zumindest zu einem Drittel, von diesen Flächen umgeben ist, wobei die Spannglieder (6) durch in Spannrichtung verlaufende Erhebungen (11) in Abstand zueinander gehalten sind. Zur Veröffentlichung gemeinsam mit der Zusammenfassung ist Fig. 2 bestimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 19/14; E04C 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/14 (2006.01); E04C 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/08 (2013.01); E01D 19/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239083 A2 20020911; EP 1239083 A3 20031112; AT 412221 B 20041125; AT A3492001 A 20040415

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040513

2004-09-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI