Global Patent Index - EP 1239084 A2

EP 1239084 A2 2002-09-11 - Building structure with concrete walls and formwork for a building structure

Title (en)

Building structure with concrete walls and formwork for a building structure

Title (de)

Bauwerk mit Wandungen, die mit Beton aufgebaut sind und Schalung für ein Bauwerk

Title (fr)

Construction avec des parois en béton et coffrage pour une construction

Publication

EP 1239084 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450040 A

Priority

AT 3502001 A

Abstract (en)

A structure (1) composed of concrete, comprises external tensioning members (5) composed of threads, whose ends are fixed in the structure wall. The tensioning members run along cut-outs (2). The cross sectional surface of the cut-outs is larger at one end, and the area increases from the inside outwards. The cut-out has a planar surface which passes through the wall.

Abstract (de)

Bauwerk mit Wandungen (1), die mit Beton aufgebaut sind, mit im wesentlichen verbundfrei, insbesondere außerhalb der Wandungen (1), angeordneten Spanngliedern (5), z. B. mit Litzen aufgebaute Spannglieder (5), wobei zumindest deren Enden, insbesondere in den Wandungen (1), festgelegt sind, und Spannglieder (5) verbundfrei durch zumindest eine Wandung (1) entlang einer durchgehenden Ausnehmung (2) geführt sind, wobei die Querschnittsfläche der Ausnehmung (2) an zumindest einem Ende größer als im Inneren ist, insbesondere daß die Querschnittsfläche der Ausnehmung von innen nach außen zunimmt, und die Ausnehmung (2) zumindest eine ebene Fläche (8) aufweist, welche durch die Wandung (1) geführt ist. Zur Veröffentlichung gemeinsam mit der Zusammenfassung ist Fig. 1 bestimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 19/14; E04C 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/14 (2006.01); E04C 5/10 (2006.01); E04C 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/10 (2013.01); E01D 19/14 (2013.01); E04C 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0393013 A1 19901017 - VORSPANN TECHNIK GMBH [AT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239084 A2 20020911; EP 1239084 A3 20031119; AT 411699 B 20040426; AT A3502001 A 20030915

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040520

2004-09-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI