Global Patent Index - EP 1239087 A1

EP 1239087 A1 2002-09-11 - Quick coupling

Title (en)

Quick coupling

Title (de)

Schnellkupplung

Title (fr)

Attache rapide

Publication

EP 1239087 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02005070 A

Priority

  • DE 10111485 A
  • DE 10159417 A

Abstract (en)

Rapid coupling to fit a tool e.g. with a rotating mechanism, at the jib (3) of a hydraulic excavator, has a linear guide at the energy circuit coupling (13). On coupling, it brings the two energy coupling points (14,15) in linear movement to each other. Linear guide has guide units at the job side and the tool side, to be brought together when the energy coupling is closed, and especially before two energy coupling points are brought together.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Schnellkupplung (1) zum Ankuppeln eines Werkzeugs an den Ausleger (3) eines Hydraulikbaggers und dergleichen, mit einem auslegerseitigen Schnellkupplungsteil (2) und einem werkzeugseitigen Schnellkupplungsteil (5), die über ein Paar beabstandeter Verriegelungsachsen (7,8) miteinander verriegelbar sind, sowie mit einer Energiekreiskupplung (13), insbesondere Hydraulikkupplung, zum automatischen Ankuppeln eines werkzeugseitigen Energieanschlusses an einen auslegerseitigen Energieanschluss, wobei die Energiekreiskupplung einen auslegerseitigen Energiekupplungsteil (14) und einen werkzeugseitigen Energiekupplungsteil (15) besitzt, die an dem auslegerseitigen Schnellkupplungsteil (2) bzw. dem werkzeugseitigen Schnellkupplungsteil (5) derart angeordnet sind, dass sie miteinander automatisch kuppeln, sobald die beiden Schnellkupplungsteile (2,5) um eine (7) erste der beiden Verriegelungsachsen in ihre Verriegelungsstellung zusammengeschwenkt werden. Erfindungsgemäß zeichnet sich die Schnellkupplung dadurch aus, dass der Energiekreiskupplung (13) eine Linearführung (23) zugeordnet ist, die die beiden Energiekupplungsteile trotz der Schwenkbewegung der Schnellkupplungsteile (14,15) beim Ankuppeln linear zueinander führt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/40 (2006.01); E02F 3/36 (2006.01); E02F 3/96 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/3663 (2013.01); E02F 3/3654 (2013.01); E02F 9/2267 (2013.01); E02F 9/2271 (2013.01); E02F 9/2275 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239087 A1 20020911; EP 1239087 B1 20120118; EP 1239087 B2 20170118; CA 2374679 A1 20020909; CA 2374679 C 20090210; CN 1246540 C 20060322; CN 1375601 A 20021023; CZ 20020828 A3 20021016; CZ 303239 B6 20120613; JP 2002348905 A 20021204; JP 4102578 B2 20080618; PL 200100 B1 20081231; PL 352565 A1 20020923; RU 2235829 C2 20040910; US 2002157287 A1 20021031; US 6813851 B2 20041109

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180312

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170403

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-15 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2017-02-28 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2017-01-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20170118

2017-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2017-01-18 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50215351

2016-06-08 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E02F 3/36 20060101ALI20160503BHEP

2016-06-08 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E02F 9/22 20060101AFI20160503BHEP

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CATERPILLAR INC.

- Effective date: 20121018

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120306

2014-04-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120118

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120306

2013-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 541992 T

- Effective date: 20120306

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120429

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-17 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 50215351

- Effective date: 20121018

2012-11-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CATERPILLAR INC.

- Effective date: 20121018

2012-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-09-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120518

2012-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-08-15 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2012-03-15 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50215351

- Effective date: 20120315

2012-03-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2012-02-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2012-02-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 541992 T

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-02-15 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2012-01-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070704

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI