Global Patent Index - EP 1239089 A2

EP 1239089 A2 2002-09-11 - Shower provided with a luminous shower head

Title (en)

Shower provided with a luminous shower head

Title (de)

Dusche, versehen mit leuchtendem Duschkopf

Title (fr)

Douche équipée avec pomme de douche lumineuse

Publication

EP 1239089 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01118325 A

Priority

IT TO20010208 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention concerns a shower comprising at least a shower head (2) for the ejection of a jet of water and a hydraulic circuit (4) for feeding said jet of water, said shower head (2) being realised in a transparent material and presenting, disposed from the opposite side of the water outlet, a luminous source (3) able to light the zone in correspondence with the jet of water coming out of the head shower (2). The luminous shower head can be installed in a shower for external spaces, said shower having the shape of a plant or a flower, for instance a sunflower. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2006.01); F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 33/00 (2006.01); F21V 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/0404 (2013.01); F21V 33/004 (2013.01); F21V 9/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239089 A2 20020911; EP 1239089 A3 20030709; IT TO20010208 A1 20020909; IT TO20010208 D0 20010309

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-05-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI